This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 11:27:32 (UTC).

Zhang v. Zhang

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Zhang filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Zhang. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1328

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Liang Zhang, As shareholder

Sunshine USA Inc., DBA Wu Liang Ye

Ru Qiu Li, As shareholder

Plaintiff / Appellants

Zhongliang Qiu, individually

Meide Zhang, individually

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Hugh H. Mo Esq.

Attorney at The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo, P.C.

225 Broadway

New York, NY 10007

Pedro Medina Esq. Jr.

Attorney at The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo, P.C.

225 Broadway

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Yan Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of David Yan

136-20 38Th Avenue

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang Brief due date as 09/07/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 09/07/2021, FILED.[3125191] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/24/2021 08:29 AM]

#29

(#29) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, informing Court of proposed due date 09/07/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 06/23/2021 by CM/ECF.[3124252] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/23/2021 12:11 AM]

27 #2

Supporting Document

27 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ru Qiu Li and Liang Zhang, FILED. Service date 06/10/2021 by CM/ECF, email. [3117421] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:58 AM]

#25

(#25) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3116946] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/09/2021 04:04 PM]

21 #2

Supporting Document

21 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#18

(#18) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, FILED. Service date 06/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3116354] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/08/2021 08:56 PM]

11 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#7

(#7) DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED JUDGMENT, dated 05/10/2021, RECEIVED.[3106569] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:27 AM]

#6

(#6) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/06/2021, RECEIVED.[3106568] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:27 AM]

#5

(#5) DISTRICT COURT PROPOSED JUDGMENT, dated 05/04/2021, RECEIVED.[3106567] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:26 AM]

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3106565] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:26 AM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, dated 12/21/2020, RECEIVED.[3106564] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:25 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/17/2018, RECEIVED.[3106558] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:24 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang Brief due date as 09/07/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 09/07/2021, FILED.[3125191] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/24/2021 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, informing Court of proposed due date 09/07/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 06/23/2021 by CM/ECF.[3124252] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/23/2021 12:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY, Pedro Medina Jr. for Liang Zhang Sunshine USA Inc. Ru Qiu Li, in case 21-1328 , [ # 26 ], ADDED.[3121231] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/16/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ru Qiu Li, Sunshine USA Inc. and Liang Zhang, FILED. Service date 06/11/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3118399] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/11/2021 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ru Qiu Li and Liang Zhang, FILED. Service date 06/10/2021 by CM/ECF, email. [3117421] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3116946] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/09/2021 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, FILED. Service date 06/09/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3116721] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/09/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellants Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, FILED.[3116357] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/08/2021 09:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, FILED. Service date 06/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3116354] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/08/2021 08:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE, to Appellees Ru Qiu Li, Sunshine USA Inc. and Liang Zhang, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3115539] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/08/2021 07:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#14) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, FILED. Service date 06/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3115524] [21-1328] [Entered: 06/08/2021 02:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3106574] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#10) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24576213, FILED.[3106572] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED JUDGMENT, dated 05/10/2021, RECEIVED.[3106569] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/06/2021, RECEIVED.[3106568] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISTRICT COURT PROPOSED JUDGMENT, dated 05/04/2021, RECEIVED.[3106567] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3106565] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, dated 12/21/2020, RECEIVED.[3106564] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/17/2018, RECEIVED.[3106558] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Zhongliang Qiu and Meide Zhang, FILED. [3106555] [21-1328] [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Yan Esq.