This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/01/2021 at 06:03:18 (UTC).

Zetia (Ezetimibe) Antitrust v. Merck & Company, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Zetia Ezetimibe Antitrust filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Merck Company, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2184

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

MERCK & COMPANY, INCORPORATED

MSP SINGAPORE CO. LLC

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION

GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.

SCHERING CORPORATION

GLENMARK GENERICS INC., USA

SCHERING PLOUGH CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

In re: ZETIA (EZETIMIBE) ANTITRUST LITIGATION

Plaintiff / Appellees

CESAR CASTILLO, INC., individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated

FWK HOLDINGS, LLC

ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen Edward Noona

Attorney at KAUFMAN & CANOLES, PC

P. O. Box 3037

Norfolk, VA 23514-3037

Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Daniel Rolf Adler

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Christopher Dean Dusseault

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Attorney at BRADLEY HAMBURGER

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jennifer L. Eaton

Attorney at VANDEVENTER BLACK, LLP

500 World Trade Center, 101 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510

R. Brendan Fee

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Steven A. Reed

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Richard Hooper Ottinger

Attorney at VANDEVENTER BLACK, LLP

500 World Trade Center, 101 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510

Jessica J. Taticchi

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Zachary M. Johns

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Dustin Mitchell Paul

Attorney at VANDEVENTER BLACK, LLP

500 World Trade Center, 101 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

William Hanes Monroe Jr.

Attorney at GLASSER & GLASSER

Crown Center, 580 East Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510-0000

Marc Christian Greco

Attorney at GLASSER & GLASSER

Crown Center, 580 East Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510-0000

Thomas M. Sobol

Attorney at HAGENS, BERMAN, SOBOL, SHAPIRO, LLP

55 Cambridge Parkway

Cambridge, MA 02142

Erin Cathleen Burns

Attorney at HAGENS, BERMAN, SOBOL, SHAPIRO, LLP

55 Cambridge Parkway

Cambridge, MA 02142

Nicholas Urban

Attorney at BERGER & MONTAGUE, PC

1818 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

RESTRICTED

#38

#36

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 42 ]. Number of days granted: 11. Reply brief due 02/23/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000861410] [20-2184] JR [Entered: 12/08/2020 09:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Erin C. Burns for FWK Holdings, LLC. [1000858104] [20-2184] Erin Burns [Entered: 12/02/2020 11:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc. to Motion [ # 42 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 12/01/2020 01:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION by Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation to extend filing time for reply brief until February 23, 2021.. Date and method of service: 11/30/2020 ecf. [1000856267] [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/30/2020 08:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. [20-2184] David Sorensen [Entered: 11/30/2020 06:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Corrected Customized BRIEFING ORDER filed -- FRAP 30(c) Schedule. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Page-Proof Opening Brief due: 01/04/2021. Page-Proof Response Brief due: 02/02/2021. Appendix under FRAP 30(c) due: 02/05/2021. All Briefs in Final Form due 7 days after FRAP 30(c) Appendix served. [20-2184] AB [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Customized BRIEFING ORDER filed -- FRAP 30(c) Schedule. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Page-Proof Opening Brief due: 01/04/2021. Page-Proof Response Brief due: 02/02/2021. Appendix under FRAP 30(c) due: 02/16/2021. All Briefs in Final Form due 7 days after FRAP 30(c) Appendix served. [20-2184]--[Edited 11/24/2020 by AB] AB [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed with a deferred appendix [ # 36 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000854400] [20-2184] AB [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER filed rescinding accelerated briefing order. Copies to all parties. [1000854396] [20-2184] AB [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION by Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation to proceed with a deferred appendix. Date and method of service: 11/23/2020 ecf. [1000853348] [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel R. Adler for Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation. [1000847552] [20-2184] Daniel Adler [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. for Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation. [1000847544] [20-2184] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 11/13/2020 01:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation to Motion [ # 6 ], Motion [ # 6 ], notice requesting response [ # 7 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-2184] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 11/13/2020 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE ISSUED to Glenmark Generics INC., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Merck & Company, Incorporated, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Schering Corporation and Schering Plough Corporation requesting response to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 6 ], Motion to expedite decision [ # 6 ]Response due 11/23/2020.[1000846507]. [20-2184] AW [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc. to accelerate case processing. , to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 11/11/2020 ecf. [1000846035] [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 11/11/2020 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William H. Monroe, Jr. for Cesar Castillo, Inc., FWK Holdings, LLC and Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.. [1000846033] [20-2184] William Monroe [Entered: 11/11/2020 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM. [20-2184] JR [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Mr. Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., Esq., Mr. Christopher D. Dusseault, Jennifer L. Eaton, R. Brendan Fee, Zachary M. Johns, Mr. Stephen Edward Noona, Richard Hooper Ottinger, Dustin Mitchell Paul, Steven A. Reed, Jessica J. Taticchi - after grant of permission to appeal Originating case number: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM. [20-2184] JR [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 20-432. Record complete? Yes. [20-2184] TF [Entered: 11/02/2020 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM. Case manager: JRice. [20-2184] TF [Entered: 11/02/2020 02:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less