This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/29/2019 at 06:10:40 (UTC).

Zafar Sheikh v. John Wheeler, et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Zafar Sheikh filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against John Wheeler. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1851

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JEFFREY NITTI

BURKE COSTANZA & CARBERRY

JOHN WHEELER

APPRAISAL RESEARCH COUNSELORS

WINDSOR ADVANTAGE

Plaintiff / Appellant

ZAFAR SHEIKH

Chicago, IL 60645

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Peter C. Kim

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

303 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Kevin Edward Steele

Attorney at BURKE COSTANZA & CARBERRY LLP

156 Washington Street

Valparaiso, IN 46383

Nancy J. Townsend

Attorney at KRIEG DEVAULT LLP

33 N. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Charles R. Franklin

Attorney at FRANKLIN LAW GROUP

181 N. Waukegan Road

Northfield, IL 60093

Craig Capilla

Attorney at FRANKLIN LAW GROUP

181 N. Waukegan Road

Northfield, IL 60093

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Zafar Sheikh

3155 W. Wallen Avenue

Chicago, IL 60645

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER re: Motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief & Motion directing clerk to serve the plaintiff-appellant via U.S. mail. [ # 11 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 07/10/2019 for Zafar Sheikh. Appellees' briefs due on or before 08/09/2019 for Appraisal Research Counselors, Burke Costanza & Carberry, Jeffrey Nitti, John Wheeler and Windsor Advantage. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/30/2019 for Appellant Zafar Sheikh. Counsel for the appellees are reminded that they should serve the pro se appellant with paper copies of all court filings. [ # 12 ] CMD [14] [7008577] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:40 AM]

#13

(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Party Zafar Sheikh. [13] [7008453] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:30 PM]

#12

(#12) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Zafar Sheikh for order directing clerk to serve the plaintiff-appellant via U.S. mail. [12] [7008447] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:25 PM]

#11

(#11) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Zafar Sheikh to extend time to file appellant's brief. [11] [7008446] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:23 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW[7004984] [10] [7004984] [19-1851] (AP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 04:01 PM]

#9

(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Craig M. Capilla for Appellee Appraisal Research Counselors. for Cary Lannin. [9] [7004941] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851]--[Edited 05/15/2019 by PS - to reflect addition of counsel] (Capilla, Craig) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:50 PM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Charles R. Franklin for Appellee Appraisal Research Counselors. for Cary Lannin. [8] [7004775] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851] (Franklin, Charles) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:36 AM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Peter C. Kim for Appellees Jeffrey Nitti and Windsor Advantage. [7] [7004651] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851] (Kim, Peter) [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:18 PM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellee John Wheeler. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7004595] [19-1851] (Townsend, Nancy) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:31 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nancy J. Townsend for Appellee John Wheeler. for Countryside Bank, Raj Badri. [5] [7004591] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851] (Townsend, Nancy) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:27 PM]

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kevin E. Steele for Appellee Burke Costanza & Carberry. for Nancy Townsend. [4] [7003820] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851] (Steele, Kevin) [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:07 AM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Zafar Sheikh. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7002888] [19-1851] (AP) [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:32 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER re: Motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief & Motion directing clerk to serve the plaintiff-appellant via U.S. mail. [ # 11 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 07/10/2019 for Zafar Sheikh. Appellees' briefs due on or before 08/09/2019 for Appraisal Research Counselors, Burke Costanza & Carberry, Jeffrey Nitti, John Wheeler and Windsor Advantage. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/30/2019 for Appellant Zafar Sheikh. Counsel for the appellees are reminded that they should serve the pro se appellant with paper copies of all court filings. [ # 12 ] CMD [14] [7008577] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Party Zafar Sheikh. [13] [7008453] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Zafar Sheikh for order directing clerk to serve the plaintiff-appellant via U.S. mail. [12] [7008447] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Zafar Sheikh to extend time to file appellant's brief. [11] [7008446] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW[7004984] [10] [7004984] [19-1851] (AP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Craig M. Capilla for Appellee Appraisal Research Counselors. for Cary Lannin. [9] [7004941] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851]--[Edited 05/15/2019 by PS - to reflect addition of counsel] (Capilla, Craig) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Charles R. Franklin for Appellee Appraisal Research Counselors. for Cary Lannin. [8] [7004775] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851] (Franklin, Charles) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Peter C. Kim for Appellees Jeffrey Nitti and Windsor Advantage. [7] [7004651] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851] (Kim, Peter) [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellee John Wheeler. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7004595] [19-1851] (Townsend, Nancy) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nancy J. Townsend for Appellee John Wheeler. for Countryside Bank, Raj Badri. [5] [7004591] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851] (Townsend, Nancy) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kevin E. Steele for Appellee Burke Costanza & Carberry. for Nancy Townsend. [4] [7003820] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1851] (Steele, Kevin) [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Zafar Sheikh. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7002888] [19-1851] (AP) [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • (#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Raj Badri, Countryside Bank, Craig A. Lannin, Nancy Townsend, Hasan Musleh, and Nidal Musleh. [2] [7001767] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Zafar Sheikh by 05/06/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 05/14/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/10/2019 for Zafar Sheikh. [1] [7001766] [19-1851] (AG) [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less