This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/13/2020 at 06:16:49 (UTC).

Zachary Reed v. Michael Dixon, et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Zachary Reed filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michael Dixon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2707

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Osage County, MO

Vincent Vanderfeltz

Michael Dixon

Adam Bennett

Vernon D. McKague, Jr.

Scott G. Parish

Patrick J. Boatman

Plaintiff / Appellant

Zachary Scott Reed

Hermann, MO 65041

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John Terry Brooks

Attorney at NEWMAN & COMLEY

P.O. Box 537

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0537

Michael G. Berry

Attorney at NEWMAN & COMLEY

P.O. Box 537

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0537

David S. Baker

Attorney at FISHER & PATTERSON

51 Corporate Woods, Suite 300, 9393 W. 110Th

Overland Park, KS 66210-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Zachary Scott Reed

324 W. Tenth Street

Hermann, MO 65041

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4963219-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Zachary Scott Reed. Brief of Zachary Scott Reed due 10/13/2020 [4963297] [20-2707] (LMT) [Entered: 10/07/2020 09:39 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/13/2020, filed by Party Mr. Zachary Scott Reed w/service 10/06/2020. [4963219] [20-2707] (ZSR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 08:39 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4958581-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Zachary Scott Reed. Brief of Zachary Scott Reed due 10/06/2020 [4958653] [20-2707] (NDW) [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:31 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/06/2020, filed by Party Mr. Zachary Scott Reed w/service 09/23/2020. [4958581] [20-2707] (ZSR) [Entered: 09/23/2020 10:32 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by John T. Brooks for Appellees Mr. Adam Bennett, Mr. Patrick J. Boatman, Michael Dixon, Mr. Vernon D. McKague, Jr., Osage County, MO and Mr. Vincent Vanderfeltz w/service 09/08/2020 [4953136] [20-2707] (JTB) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:54 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by David S. Baker for Appellee Mr. Scott G. Parish w/service 08/26/2020 [4949506] [20-2707] (DSB) [Entered: 08/26/2020 11:21 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Zachary Scott Reed due 09/23/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4945679] [20-2707] (CMH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 05:02 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 4/20/2020, Order dated 8/13/2020, and Judgment datd 8/14/2020.[4945678] [20-2707] (CMH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 04:58 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4963219-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Zachary Scott Reed. Brief of Zachary Scott Reed due 10/13/2020 [4963297] [20-2707] (LMT) [Entered: 10/07/2020 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/13/2020, filed by Party Mr. Zachary Scott Reed w/service 10/06/2020. [4963219] [20-2707] (ZSR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 08:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4958581-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Zachary Scott Reed. Brief of Zachary Scott Reed due 10/06/2020 [4958653] [20-2707] (NDW) [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/06/2020, filed by Party Mr. Zachary Scott Reed w/service 09/23/2020. [4958581] [20-2707] (ZSR) [Entered: 09/23/2020 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by John T. Brooks for Appellees Mr. Adam Bennett, Mr. Patrick J. Boatman, Michael Dixon, Mr. Vernon D. McKague, Jr., Osage County, MO and Mr. Vincent Vanderfeltz w/service 09/08/2020 [4953136] [20-2707] (JTB) [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by David S. Baker for Appellee Mr. Scott G. Parish w/service 08/26/2020 [4949506] [20-2707] (DSB) [Entered: 08/26/2020 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by David S. Baker for Appellee Mr. Scott G. Parish w/service 08/25/2020 [4949174] [20-2707]--[Edited 08/26/2020 by NDW] This document has been sealed as a corrected form has been filed 8/26/2020 (DSB) [Entered: 08/25/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DOCKET NOTE: Appellant's mailing address has been updated to 324 W. Tenth Street, Hermann, MO 65041 and is currently reflected on the docket sheet. The appellate documents issued on 8/14/2020 were also mailed to this address. [4946305] [20-2707] (CMH) [Entered: 08/18/2020 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Zachary Scott Reed due 09/23/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4945679] [20-2707] (CMH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 4/20/2020, Order dated 8/13/2020, and Judgment datd 8/14/2020.[4945678] [20-2707] (CMH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4945675] [20-2707] (CMH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less