This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2021 at 06:03:21 (UTC).

Zachariah Robertson, et al v. Enbridge US Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Zachariah Robertson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Enbridge US Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2374

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

CYPRESS ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT TIR LLC

CLEVELAND INTEGRITY SERVICES INC

Plaintiff / Appellees

ZACHARIAH ROBERTSON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

ANGEL HERNANDEZ, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

GREG HUGGINS, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

GORDON LUNSTED, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

ENBRIDGE US INC

CYPRESS ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT TIR LLC

CLEVELAND INTEGRITY SERVICES INC

ZACHARIAH ROBERTSON

GREG HUGGINS

ANGEL HERNANDEZ

GORDON LUNSTED

Petitioner / Appellants

ONSHORE QUALITY CONTROL SPECIALIST LLC

AVERY TECHNICAL RESOURCES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorney

Ryan O. Hemminger Esq.

Attorney at Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl

525 William Penn Place, 28Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Plaintiff / Appellee and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joshua P. Geist Esq.

Attorney at Goodrich & Geist

3634 California Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15212

William F. Goodrich Esq.

Attorney at Goodrich & Geist

3634 California Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15212

Richard Burch Esq.

11 Greenway Plaza

Houston, TX 77046

Matthew T. Logue Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Logue

200 First Avenue, Third Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Shelly R. Pagac Esq.

Attorney at Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti

301 Grant Street, One Oxford Centre, 38Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

John P. Phillips Esq.

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw

700 Milam Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Timothy M. Watson Esq.

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw

700 Milam Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Ryan O. Hemminger Esq.

Attorney at Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl

525 William Penn Place, 28Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Julianne Lomax Esq.

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Kristy L. Albrecht Esq.

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron

51 Broadway, Suite 400

Fargo, ND 58102

Joseph M. Sokolowski Esq.

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron

200 South Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Mary Fee Esq.

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron

200 South Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Joseph M. Sokolowski

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron

200 South Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

29 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

29 #1

Standing Order

#28

#26

#25

24 #2

Plaintiffs-Appellees Supplemental Appendix

24 #1

Response

22 #2

Supplemental Appendix to Response to Appellants' Expedited Motion for Stay Pendi

22 #1

Response to Appellants' Expedited Motion for Stay Pending Appeal

#7

#6

#5

#3

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Report

#1

Civil Case Docketed

#3

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Onshore Quality Control Specialist LLC and MBF Inspection Services Inc and Appellee Avery Technical Resources Inc due on or before 10/25/2021. Appendix due on or before 10/25/2021. [21-2374, 21-2387] (PDB) [Entered: 09/13/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER (CHAGARES, GREENAWAY JR. and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges) The standard for issuance of a stay is like that for issuance of a preliminary injunction, and requires consideration of four factors: (1) whether the stay applicant has made a strong showing that he is likely to succeed on the merits; (2) whether the applicant will be irreparably injured absent a stay; (3) whether issuance of the stay will substantially injure the other parties interested in the proceeding; and (4) where the public interest lies." Jackson v. Danberg, 656 F.3d 157, 162 (3d Cir. 2011). Under this conjunctive analysis, Appellants fail to show that they are likely to succeed on the merits or that irreparable harm will result from denying the stay. Because Appellants have failed to make the requisite showing, the foregoing motion for an emergency stay of the District Court proceedings pending appeal is denied. Panel No.: ECO-033-E. Chagares, Authoring Judge. (PDB) [Entered: 09/10/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ECF FILER: Reply by Appellants Avery Technical Resources Inc and Onshore Quality Control Specialist LLC in 21-2374 to motion, motion, Response, Response. Certificate of Service dated 08/31/2021. Service made by ECF 87. (JMS) [Entered: 08/31/2021 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Julianne C. Lomax on behalf of Appellee(s) Zachariah Robertson, Angel Hernandez, Gordon Lunsted, Greg Huggins. [21-2374] (JL) [Entered: 08/30/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Zachariah Robertson, Angel Hernandez, Greg Huggins and Gordon Lunsted to motion for stay, motion to Expedite. Certificate of Service dated 08/30/2021. [21-2374] (RB) [Entered: 08/30/2021 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard J. (Rex) Burch on behalf of Appellee(s) Zachariah Robertson, Angel Hernandez, Gordon Lunsted, Greg Huggins. [21-2374] (RB) [Entered: 08/29/2021 11:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Enbridge US Inc in 21-2374, 21-2387 to motion for stay, motion to Expedite. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2021. (TMW) [Entered: 08/29/2021 07:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) Any response to Appellants' Motion to Stay the Case Pending Appeal must be filed by Monday, August 30, 2021 at 9:00 am. (AV) [Entered: 08/26/2021 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Avery Technical Resources Inc and Onshore Quality Control Specialist LLC in 21-2374 to stay Case Pending Appeal, to Expedite Motion. Certificate of Service dated 08/25/2021. Service made by ECF.--[Edited 08/26/2021 by PDB] (JMS) [Entered: 08/25/2021 08:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kristy Albrecht on behalf of Appellant(s) Onshore Quality Control Specialists, LLC; Avery Technical Resources, Inc.. [21-2374] (KLA) [Entered: 08/18/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Avery Technical Resources Inc and Onshore Quality Control Specialist LLC advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-2374] (MF) [Entered: 08/05/2021 07:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Avery Technical Resources Inc and Onshore Quality Control Specialist LLC. [21-2374] (MF) [Entered: 08/05/2021 07:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Onshore Quality Control Specialist LLC. [21-2374] (MF) [Entered: 08/05/2021 07:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Avery Technical Resources Inc. [21-2374] (MF) [Entered: 08/05/2021 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Avery Technical Resources Inc and Onshore Quality Control Specialist LLC. [21-2374] (MF) [Entered: 08/05/2021 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mary Fee on behalf of Appellant(s) Onshore Quality Control Specialists, LLC and Avery Technical Resources, Inc. [-WITHDRAWN 8/13/21.] [21-2374]--[Edited 08/13/2021 by CJG] (MF) [Entered: 08/05/2021 07:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK ORDER consoldating the appeals at Nos. 21-2374 and 21-2387 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, and disposition. Appellants in Nos. 21-2374 and 21-2387 are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). Appellees may elect to file a consolidated brief for these two appeals. Appeal Nos. 21-2374 and 21-2387 are further consolidated with No. 20-3385 for disposition only. It is noted that Appeal No. 20-3385 will be briefed separately from Appeal Nos. 21-2374 and 21-2387 (AMR) [Entered: 07/28/2021 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK ORDER The actions at Nos. 20-3385 and 21-2374 are hereby consolidated for disposition only. [21-2374, 20-3385] (PDB) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Avery Technical Resources Inc and Onshore Quality Control Specialist LLC in District Court No. 2-19-cv-01080. (PDB) [Entered: 07/23/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cleveland Integrity Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Enbridge (U.S), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Fee