This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/07/2019 at 06:08:24 (UTC).

Yvette Sanders v. QuikTrip Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 Yvette Sanders filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QuikTrip Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11767

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

QUIKTRIP CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

YVETTE ADELLE SANDERS, Individually and as surviving parent as administratrix for the estate of Andrew Thomas Spencer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicole C. Leet

Attorney at Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett & Brieske, LLP

950 E Paces Ferry Rd Ne Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30326

Michael J. Rust

Attorney at Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett & Brieske, LLP

950 E Paces Ferry Rd Ne Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30326

Laurie Webb Daniel

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

1180 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 1800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Matthew David Friedlander

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

1180 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 1800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

E. Michael Moran

Attorney at Law & Moran

563 Spring St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30308

James Darren Summerville

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

400 Colony Sq Ste 2000, 1201 Peachtree St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30306

Peter Law

Attorney at Law & Moran

563 Spring St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30308

Maxwell Kent Thelen

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

400 Colony Sq Ste 2000, 1201 Peachtree St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30306

Elizabeth A. Rose

Attorney at Law & Moran

563 Spring St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #4

Appellant Appendix Vol IV

Open Document #3

Appellant Appendix Vol III

Open Document #2

Appellant Appendix Vol II

Open Document #1

Appellant Appendix Vol I

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document #1

ATTY-1A Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment- Doc #108

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketRecord on Appeal filed. Exhibits, 1 Envelope (#73 Flashdrive & #81 CD) [Entered: 06/27/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Readiness filed as to Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders. [Entered: 06/27/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders. 4 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 06/25/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix filed [4 VOLUMES] by Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders. [19-11767] (ECF: Maxwell Thelen) [Entered: 06/24/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders. [Entered: 06/18/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Yvette Adelle Sanders. [19-11767] (ECF: Maxwell Thelen) [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew David Friedlander for Appellee QuikTrip Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11767] (ECF: Matthew Friedlander) [Entered: 06/05/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Matthew David Friedlander for Appellee QuikTrip Corporation. [19-11767] (ECF: Matthew Friedlander) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Maxwell Kent Thelen for Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11767] (ECF: Maxwell Thelen) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Maxwell Kent Thelen for Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders. [19-11767] (ECF: Maxwell Thelen) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael J. Rust for QuikTrip Corporation. [19-11767] (ECF: Michael Rust) [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicole C. Leet for QuikTrip Corporation. [19-11767] (ECF: Nicole Leet) [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Laurie Webb Daniel for QuikTrip Corporation is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 05/21/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew D. Friedlander for QuikTrip Corporation [19-11767] (ECF: Matthew Friedlander) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laurie Webb Daniel for QuikTrip Corporation [19-11767] (ECF: Matthew Friedlander) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 04/24/2019 as to Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders. [Entered: 05/08/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders on 04/24/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/17/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/22/2019 as to Appellant Yvette Adelle Sanders. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/05/2019 as to Appellee QuikTrip Corporation [Entered: 05/08/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QuikTrip Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Darren Summerville

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth A. Rose

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maxwell Kent Thelen