Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/28/2021 at 06:10:36 (UTC).

Young v. Donovan

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Young filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Donovan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-159

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

T.J. Donovan, in his official capacity as attorney general of Vermont

Plaintiff / Appellant

Huguette Nicole Young

Junction City, OR 97448

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Benjamin Battles Esq.

Attorney at Vermont Office of the Attorney General

109 State Street

Montpelier, VT 05609

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Huguette Nicole Young

24968 Lawrence Road

Junction City, OR 97448

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee T.J. Donovan, informing the Court that appellee's counsel will not be entering an appearance, RECEIVED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3040840] [21-159] [Entered: 02/22/2021 11:53 AM]

#15

(#15) NOTICE, to Appellee T.J. Donovan, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3040746] [21-159] [Entered: 02/22/2021 11:04 AM]

#14

(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [10], on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3036367] [21-159] [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:24 AM]

#13

(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to file late, [9], on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3036354] [21-159] [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:18 AM]

#12

(#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for Declaratory relief, [8], on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED.[3036342] [21-159] [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:13 AM]

#11

(#11) BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF.[3034232] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:41 AM]

#7

(#7) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF.[3034228] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:33 AM]

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF.[3034227] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:31 AM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3023546] [21-159] [Entered: 01/28/2021 09:18 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3023539] [21-159] [Entered: 01/28/2021 09:18 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY, Benjamin Battles, for Appellee T.J. Donovan, TERMINATED.[3064217] [21-159] [Entered: 03/26/2021 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee T.J. Donovan, informing the Court that appellee's counsel will not be entering an appearance, RECEIVED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3040840] [21-159] [Entered: 02/22/2021 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE, to Appellee T.J. Donovan, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3040746] [21-159] [Entered: 02/22/2021 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [10], on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3036367] [21-159] [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to file late, [9], on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3036354] [21-159] [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for Declaratory relief, [8], on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED.[3036342] [21-159] [Entered: 02/16/2021 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF.[3034232] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#10) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3034231] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#9) MOTION, to file late, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3034230] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#8) MOTION, for Declaratory relief, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3034229] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF.[3034228] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF.[3034227] [21-159] [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3029455] [21-159] [Entered: 02/04/2021 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3023546] [21-159] [Entered: 01/28/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3023539] [21-159] [Entered: 01/28/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Huguette Nicole Young, FILED. [3023525] [21-159] [Entered: 01/28/2021 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Huguette Nicole Young