This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/24/2022 at 06:03:12 (UTC).

Yorktown Systems Group Inc v. Threat Tec LLC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 Yorktown Systems Group Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Threat Tec LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-13598

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

YORKTOWN SYSTEMS GROUP INC

Defendant / Appellant

THREAT TEC LLC

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Emily J. Chancey

Walter Brad English

Mary Ann Hanke

Robert Goodwin Jones

Benjamin Lee McArthur

Matthew Schoonover

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Whitney Paige Lott

Kimberly Bessiere Martin

Sarah S. Osborne

Scott Burnett Smith

Hunter Wade Pearce

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Christopher L. Lockwood

Richard J.R. Raleigh Jr.

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Threat Tec LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/30/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 12/21/2022 05:01 PM]

#25

(#25) TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Date filed: 12/19/2022, DE # 103, 104, & 105. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Christina Decker, Filer: Threat Tec LLC, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 05/27/2022 , Other Hearings 07/11/2022. [Entered: 12/21/2022 04:58 PM]

#24

(#24) Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Date filed: 12/13/2022, DE # 102. Transcript Order: Christina Decker, 11/08/2022, Threat Tec LLC, Other Hearings 05/27/2022 , Other Hearings 07/11/2022. [Entered: 12/13/2022 05:07 PM]

#23

(#23) Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Christina Decker as to Appellant Threat Tec LLC. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 11/08/2022. [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:14 PM]

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Walter Brad English for Appellee Yorktown Systems Group Inc. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13598] (ECF: Walter English) [Entered: 11/23/2022 02:20 PM]

#20

(#20) Modified Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Appellant Threat Tec LLC. [22-13598] (ECF: Kimberly Martin) [Entered: 11/18/2022 02:38 PM]

#19

(#19) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Goodwin Jones for Yorktown Systems Group Inc. [22-13598] (ECF: Robert Jones) [Entered: 11/10/2022 04:12 PM]

#18

(#18) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mary Ann Hanke for Yorktown Systems Group Inc. [22-13598] (ECF: Mary Hanke) [Entered: 11/10/2022 04:01 PM]

#8

(#8) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Appellant Threat Tec LLC. [22-13598] (ECF: Kimberly Martin) [Entered: 11/08/2022 05:04 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Appellant Threat Tec LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13598] (ECF: Kimberly Martin) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:46 PM]

#5

(#5) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Hunter Wade Pearce for Appellant Threat Tec LLC. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-13598] (ECF: Hunter Pearce) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:42 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Hunter Wade Pearce for Threat Tec LLC. [22-13598] (ECF: Hunter Pearce) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:40 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Threat Tec LLC. [22-13598] (ECF: Kimberly Martin) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:24 PM]

#2

(#2) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Burnett Smith for Threat Tec LLC [22-13598] (ECF: Scott Smith) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:22 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order, DE # 88

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Threat Tec LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/30/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 12/21/2022 05:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Date filed: 12/19/2022, DE # 103, 104, & 105. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Christina Decker, Filer: Threat Tec LLC, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 05/27/2022 , Other Hearings 07/11/2022. [Entered: 12/21/2022 04:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Date filed: 12/13/2022, DE # 102. Transcript Order: Christina Decker, 11/08/2022, Threat Tec LLC, Other Hearings 05/27/2022 , Other Hearings 07/11/2022. [Entered: 12/13/2022 05:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Court Reporter acknowledgment not filed. Letter issued to Court Reporter Christina Decker as to Appellant Threat Tec LLC. Transcript is due to be filed in District Court 30 days from 11/08/2022. [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Walter Brad English for Appellee Yorktown Systems Group Inc. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13598] (ECF: Walter English) [Entered: 11/23/2022 02:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Modified Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Appellant Threat Tec LLC. [22-13598] (ECF: Kimberly Martin) [Entered: 11/18/2022 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Goodwin Jones for Yorktown Systems Group Inc. [22-13598] (ECF: Robert Jones) [Entered: 11/10/2022 04:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mary Ann Hanke for Yorktown Systems Group Inc. [22-13598] (ECF: Mary Hanke) [Entered: 11/10/2022 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily J. Chancey for Yorktown Systems Group Inc. [22-13598] (ECF: Emily Chancey) [Entered: 11/10/2022 03:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Goodwin Jones for Yorktown Systems Group Inc. [22-13598]--[Edited 11/10/2022 by EBL] (ECF: Walter English) [Entered: 11/10/2022 02:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Walter Brad English for Yorktown Systems Group Inc. [22-13598] (ECF: Walter English) [Entered: 11/10/2022 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Appellant Threat Tec LLC. [22-13598] (ECF: Kimberly Martin) [Entered: 11/08/2022 05:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket(#7) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Threat Tec LLC, Court Reporter: Christina Decker, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 05/27/2022 , Other Hearings 06/03/2022 , Other Hearings 07/11/2022. [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Appellant Threat Tec LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13598] (ECF: Kimberly Martin) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Hunter Wade Pearce for Appellant Threat Tec LLC. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-13598] (ECF: Hunter Pearce) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Hunter Wade Pearce for Threat Tec LLC. [22-13598] (ECF: Hunter Pearce) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Threat Tec LLC. [22-13598] (ECF: Kimberly Martin) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Burnett Smith for Threat Tec LLC [22-13598] (ECF: Scott Smith) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Threat Tec LLC on 10/24/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/10/2022 as to Appellant Threat Tec LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/25/2022 as to Appellee Yorktown Systems Group Inc. [Entered: 10/27/2022 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less