This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/30/2020 at 06:48:06 (UTC).

Yarinell Roman, et al v. Spirit Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Yarinell Roman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Spirit Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13699

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

PAUL ROBERTS, II

YARINELL ROMAN

JOAQUIN RIVERA

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellee

SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew Peterson

Attorney at Varnell & Warwick, PA

1101 E Cumberland Ave Ste 201H #105

Tampa, FL 33602

Erika Roxanne Willis

Attorney at Varnell & Warwick, PA

1101 E Cumberland Ave Ste 201H #105

Tampa, FL 33602

Janet R. Varnell

Attorney at Varnell & Warwick, PA

1101 E Cumberland Ave Ste 201H #105

Tampa, FL 33602

Brian W. Warwick

Attorney at Varnell & Warwick, PA

1101 E Cumberland Ave Ste 201H #105

Tampa, FL 33602

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Paul T. Geske

Attorney at McGuire Law, PC

55 W Wacker Dr Fl 9

Chicago, IL 60601

David P. Healy

Attorney at Law Offices of David P. Healy

2846 Remington Green Cir Ste B

Tallahassee, FL 32308-3763

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott R. Torpey

Attorney at Jaffe Raitt Heuer & Weiss

27777 Franklin Rd Ste 2500

Southfield, MI 48034-8222

Carly Abramson Kligler

Attorney at Leon Cosgrove, LLP

255 Alhambra Cir Fl 8

Miami, FL 33134

Alec H. Schultz

Attorney at Leon Cosgrove, LLP

255 Alhambra Cir Fl 8

Miami, FL 33134

Timothy J. O'Connell

Attorney at Jaffe Raitt Heuer & Weiss

27777 Franklin Rd Ste 2500

Southfield, MI 48034-8222

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

DC Order Appealed DE# 74

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket28-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Yarinell Roman, Paul Roberts, II and Joaquin Rivera. Appellants brief due on 01/11/2021 as to Appellants Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts II and Yarinell Roman. Appendix due on 01/19/2021 as to Appellants Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts II and Yarinell Roman. [Entered: 11/17/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/14/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT FILED 11/2/2020. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, Filer: Joaquin Rivera, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 11/02/2020, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 10/17/2019. [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 10/22/2020, Joaquin Rivera, Motion Hearing 10/17/2019. Estimated filing date 11/6/2020 [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Scott R. Torpey for Appellee SAVE. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13699] (ECF: Scott Torpey) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Joaquin Rivera, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 10/17/2019. [Entered: 10/22/2020 06:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-13699] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 10/21/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 10/20/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carly Abramson Kligler for SAVE. [20-13699] (ECF: Carly Kligler) [Entered: 10/14/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alec H. Schultz for SAVE. [20-13699] (ECF: Alec Schultz) [Entered: 10/14/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott R. Torpey for SAVE. [20-13699] (ECF: Scott Torpey) [Entered: 10/14/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Scott R. Torpey is GRANTED by clerk. [9211080-2] [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of deficient Transcript Order Form filed by Brian W. Warwick for Yarinell Roman, Paul Roberts, II and Joaquin Rivera. Document states there were no hearings. Counsel must file a corrected Transcript Order form. [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Scott R. Torpey for Appellee SAVE. [9211080-1] [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Janet R. Varnell for Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman. [20-13699] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13699] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman. [20-13699] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Brian W. Warwick for Appellants Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman. No hearings. [20-13699] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian W. Warwick for Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman. [20-13699] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman on 09/30/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/15/2020 as to Appellant Joaquin Rivera, Paul Roberts, II and Yarinell Roman. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/29/2020 as to Appellee Spirit Airlines, Inc. [Entered: 10/05/2020 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPIRIT AIRLINES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carly Abramson Kligler