This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2021 at 06:08:08 (UTC).

Yarbrough v. Sante Fe ISD

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Yarbrough filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sante Fe ISD. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-40519

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Chase Yarbrough

Defendant / Appellees

Sante Fe Independent School District

Doctor Leigh Wall

Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and Their Successors in Office in Their Official Capacities

Mark Kanipes

Richard Davis

Jess Golightly

Matthew Bentley

Christopher Cavness

Raymond Buse

Marie Griffin

Taylor Wulf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Seth Kretzer

Attorney at Law Office of Seth Kretzer

9119 S. Gessner Road

Houston, TX 77074

Lewis M. Chandler

Attorney at Chandler Law Firm, L.L.P.

4141 Southwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77027

Sherry Scott Chandler

4141 Southwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan Griffin Brush

Attorney at Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P.

5718 Westheimer Road

Houston, TX 77057

Amy Dawn Demmler

Attorney at Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P.

5718 Westheimer Road

Houston, TX 77057

Clay Thomas Grover Esq.

Attorney at Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P.

5718 Westheimer Road

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Chase Yarbrough for filing opening brief until 09/29/2021 [21-40519] (Seth Kretzer ) [Entered: 08/29/2021 11:39 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Lewis M. Chandler ) [Entered: 08/06/2021 01:14 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Lewis M. Chandler is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [21-40519] (LBM) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:16 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Sherry Scott Chandler ) [Entered: 07/30/2021 11:12 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Sherry Scott Chandler ) [Entered: 07/26/2021 08:43 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/01/2021 for Appellant Chase Yarbrough. [21-40519] (MRW) [Entered: 07/23/2021 09:09 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Sante Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall, Mr. Mark Kanipes, Mr. Richard Davis, Mr. Jess Golightly, Mr. Matthew Bentley, Mr. Christopher Cavness, Mr. Taylor Wulf, Ms. Marie Griffin and Mr. Raymond Buse to amend caption [9622253-2]. Date of service: 07/19/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Brush, Demmler, Grover; Attorney for Appellant: Kretzer; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Chandler [21-40519] (Jonathan Griffin Brush ) [Entered: 07/19/2021 04:41 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Amy Dawn Demmler for Mr. Matthew Bentley, Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and Their Successors in Office in Their Official Capacities, Mr. Raymond Buse, Mr. Christopher Cavness, Mr. Richard Davis, Mr. Jess Golightly, Ms. Marie Griffin, Mr. Mark Kanipes, Sante Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall and Mr. Taylor Wulf for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Amy Dawn Demmler ) [Entered: 07/15/2021 03:24 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Clay Thomas Grover ) [Entered: 07/15/2021 03:22 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40519] (Jonathan Griffin Brush ) [Entered: 07/15/2021 03:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40519] (Seth Kretzer ) [Entered: 07/15/2021 10:17 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9618608-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 07/29/2021 for Appellant Chase Yarbrough [21-40519] (MAS) [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:43 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Chase Yarbrough [21-40519] (ABT) [Entered: 07/08/2021 04:29 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Chase Yarbrough. Extension Granted in Part to and including 09/16/2021. Reason: Lacking Substantial Reason(s). A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 09/16/2021 for Appellant Chase Yarbrough [21-40519] (PAC) [Entered: 08/30/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Chase Yarbrough for filing opening brief until 09/29/2021 [21-40519] (Seth Kretzer ) [Entered: 08/29/2021 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lewis M. Chandler for party(s) Appellant Chase Yarbrough, in case 21-40519 [21-40519] (ABT) [Entered: 08/09/2021 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Lewis M. Chandler ) [Entered: 08/06/2021 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Lewis M. Chandler is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [21-40519] (LBM) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Sherry Scott Chandler ) [Entered: 07/30/2021 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sheryl Scott Chandler for Appellant Chase Yarbrough in 21-40519 [21-40519] (ABT) [Entered: 07/27/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Sherry Scott Chandler ) [Entered: 07/26/2021 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/01/2021 for Appellant Chase Yarbrough. [21-40519] (MRW) [Entered: 07/23/2021 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-40519] (MRW) [Entered: 07/23/2021 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Sante Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall, Mr. Mark Kanipes, Mr. Richard Davis, Mr. Jess Golightly, Mr. Matthew Bentley, Mr. Christopher Cavness, Mr. Taylor Wulf, Ms. Marie Griffin and Mr. Raymond Buse to amend caption [9622253-2]. Date of service: 07/19/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Brush, Demmler, Grover; Attorney for Appellant: Kretzer; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Chandler [21-40519] (Jonathan Griffin Brush ) [Entered: 07/19/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jonathan Griffin Brush for party(s) Appellee Mark Kanipes Appellee Marie Griffin Appellee Taylor Wulf Appellee Sante Fe Independent School District Appellee Jess Golightly Appellee Christopher Cavness Appellee Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and Their Successors in Office in Their Official Capacities Appellee Richard Davis Appellee Leigh Wall Appellee Raymond Buse Appellee Matthew Bentley, in case 21-40519 [21-40519] (CAG) [Entered: 07/19/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Clay Thomas Grover for party(s) Appellee Mark Kanipes Appellee Marie Griffin Appellee Taylor Wulf Appellee Sante Fe Independent School District Appellee Jess Golightly Appellee Christopher Cavness Appellee Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and Their Successors in Office in Their Official Capacities Appellee Richard Davis Appellee Leigh Wall Appellee Raymond Buse Appellee Matthew Bentley, in case 21-40519 [21-40519] (CAG) [Entered: 07/19/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Taylor Wulf in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Marie Griffin in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Raymond Buse in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Christopher Cavness in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Matthew Bentley in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Jess Golightly in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Richard Davis in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Mark Kanipes in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and Their Successors in Office in Their Official Capacities in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Leigh Wall in 21-40519, Attorney Amy Dawn Demmler for Appellee Sante Fe Independent School District in 21-40519 [21-40519] (CAG) [Entered: 07/19/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Amy Dawn Demmler for Mr. Matthew Bentley, Board of Trustees for the Santa Fe Independent School District and Their Successors in Office in Their Official Capacities, Mr. Raymond Buse, Mr. Christopher Cavness, Mr. Richard Davis, Mr. Jess Golightly, Ms. Marie Griffin, Mr. Mark Kanipes, Sante Fe Independent School District, Leigh Wall and Mr. Taylor Wulf for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Amy Dawn Demmler ) [Entered: 07/15/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40519] (Clay Thomas Grover ) [Entered: 07/15/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40519] (Jonathan Griffin Brush ) [Entered: 07/15/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40519] (Seth Kretzer ) [Entered: 07/15/2021 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9618608-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 07/29/2021 for Appellant Chase Yarbrough [21-40519] (MAS) [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Chase Yarbrough [21-40519] (ABT) [Entered: 07/08/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Santa Fe Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Dawn Demmler