This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/17/2020 at 06:36:48 (UTC).

Yu v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Yu filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1803

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

YANBIN YU

ZHONGXUAN ZHANG

Defendant / Appellees

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Daniel Johnson Jr.

Attorney at Dan Johnson Law Group

400 Oyster Point Boulevard

South San Francisco, CA 94080

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David S. Chun

Attorney at Ropes and Gray LLP

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang, Entries of Appearance, Docketing Statement, and Certificate of Interest [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [698314] [LMN] [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:12 PM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang. Service: 06/01/2020 by email. [698277] [20-1803] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 7 ] [Daniel Johnson] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:08 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang. Service: 06/01/2020 by email. [698276] [20-1803] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 7 ] [Daniel Johnson] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:05 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Robert G. Litts as of counsel for Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang. Service: 06/01/2020 by email. [698271] [20-1803] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 7 ] [Daniel Johnson] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:03 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Daniel Johnson Jr. as principal counsel for Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang. Service: 06/01/2020 by email. [698268] [20-1803] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 7 ] [Daniel Johnson] [Entered: 06/01/2020 01:59 PM]

#2

(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals (20-1760 with 20-1803). Appellants' opening brief is due no later than July 17, 2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [695689] [20-1760, 20-1803] [LMN] [Entered: 05/19/2020 02:41 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang, Entries of Appearance, Docketing Statement, and Certificate of Interest [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [698314] [LMN] [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang. Service: 06/01/2020 by email. [698277] [20-1803] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 7 ] [Daniel Johnson] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang. Service: 06/01/2020 by email. [698276] [20-1803] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 7 ] [Daniel Johnson] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Robert G. Litts as of counsel for Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang. Service: 06/01/2020 by email. [698271] [20-1803] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 7 ] [Daniel Johnson] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Daniel Johnson Jr. as principal counsel for Appellants Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang. Service: 06/01/2020 by email. [698268] [20-1803] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 7 ] [Daniel Johnson] [Entered: 06/01/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals (20-1760 with 20-1803). Appellants' opening brief is due no later than July 17, 2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [695689] [20-1760, 20-1803] [LMN] [Entered: 05/19/2020 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/04/2020. [695238] Entry of Appearance is due 06/01/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/01/2020. Docketing Statement is due 06/01/2020. Appellants' brief is due 07/17/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 05/18/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David S Chun