This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:48 (UTC).

Yada Smith v. Wilmington Svngs Fund Scty FSB, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Yada Smith filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wilmington Svngs Fund Scty FSB. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10787

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SAMUEL G. DAVIDSON

Dallas, TX 75201

JOSEPH P. GRIFFITH

Dallas, TX 75201

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, as trustee for Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED

PETER S. WAHBY

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellant

YADA SMITH

Cedar Hill, TX 75104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph P. Griffith

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue, Jp Morgan Chase Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Samuel Guy Davison

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue, Jp Morgan Chase Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Justin Lewis Bernstein

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

300 W. 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Peter S. Wahby

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue, Jp Morgan Chase Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Yada Smith

906 Ponds Court

Cedar Hill, TX 75104

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10787] (Samuel Guy Davison ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:41 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10787] (Justin Lewis Bernstein ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:30 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joseph P. Griffith for Mr. Samuel G. Davidson, Mr. Joseph P. Griffith, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated, Mr. Peter S. Wahby and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10787] (Joseph P. Griffith ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:55 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10787] (Peter S. Wahby ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:40 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Yada Smith. [19-10787] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:15 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102679-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/06/2019 for Appellant Yada Smith [19-10787] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:51 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Yada Smith [19-10787] (LEF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:31 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Samuel Guy Davison for party(s) Appellee Joseph P. Griffith Appellee Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated Appellee Samuel G. Davidson Appellee Peter S. Wahby Appellee Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 19-10787 [19-10787] (CCR) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Justin Lewis Bernstein for party(s) Appellee Joseph P. Griffith Appellee Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated Appellee Samuel G. Davidson Appellee Peter S. Wahby Appellee Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 19-10787 [19-10787] (CCR) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Peter S. Wahby for party(s) Appellee Joseph P. Griffith, Appellee Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated, Appellee Samuel G. Davidson Appellee Peter S. Wahby, Appellee Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 19-10787 [19-10787] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joseph P. Griffith for Appellee Joseph P. Griffith in 19-10787, Attorney Joseph P. Griffith for Appellee Peter S. Wahby in 19-10787, Attorney Joseph P. Griffith for Appellee Samuel G. Davidson in 19-10787, Attorney Joseph P. Griffith for Appellee Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated in 19-10787, Attorney Joseph P. Griffith for Appellee Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 19-10787 [19-10787] (CB) [Entered: 08/12/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10787] (Samuel Guy Davison ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10787] (Justin Lewis Bernstein ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joseph P. Griffith for Mr. Samuel G. Davidson, Mr. Joseph P. Griffith, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated, Mr. Peter S. Wahby and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10787] (Joseph P. Griffith ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10787] (Peter S. Wahby ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Yada Smith. [19-10787] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10787] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-2065. Electronic ROA due on 08/19/2019. [19-10787] (PAC) [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Yada Smith. Fee deadline satisfied [19-10787] (PAC) [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102679-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/06/2019 for Appellant Yada Smith [19-10787] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Yada Smith [19-10787] (LEF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.