This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/18/2021 at 07:52:41 (UTC).

Xuejie He, et al v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Xuejie He filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2546

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

STATE OF NEW YORK

UNION CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT

GUTTENBERG POLICE DEPARTMENT

HUDSON HOSPITAL OPCO LLC

CAREPOINT HEALTH CHRIST HOSPITAL

HUDSON COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE

DELTA AIR LINES INC

ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LIMITED

TAOBAO

ASLAN AVIATION SERVICES (SHANGHAI) CO LTD

DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP PLLC

COALITION FOR THE HOMELESS

CATHOLIC CHARITIES COMMUNITY SERVICES CENTER

NEW YORK CITY

BILL DE BLASIO

NEW YORK CITY RESCUE MISSION

Plaintiff / Appellants

XUEJIE HE

New York, NY 10038

HEYANGJING SHI

Staten Island, NY 10301

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorney

J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Xuejie He

40 Ann Street

New York, NY 10038

Heyangjing Shi

162 Westervelt Avenue

Staten Island, NY 10301

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Court Opinion Order

1 #3

Case Caption

1 #4

Standing Order

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

5 #1

Order re: Page/Word Limits

5 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney J. Andrew Ruymann, Esq. for Appellee USA of non-participation in this appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/04/2021. Service made by US mail. [21-2546] (JAR) [Entered: 10/04/2021 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER (Clerk) No action will be taken on the motion for informa pauperis as it is unnecessary. It is noted that the District Court previously granted Appellants leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (SB) [Entered: 09/17/2021 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Xuejie He and Heyangjing Shi due on or before 10/20/2021. Appendix due on or before 10/20/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 09/10/2021 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FOLLOW UP LETTER to J. Andrew Ruymann, Esq. for USA requesting Appearance Form on or before 09/24/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 09/10/2021 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTIONS filed by Appellants Xuejie He and Heyangjing Shi to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (CJG) [Entered: 09/10/2021 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 08/19/2021 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Xuejie He and Heyangjing Shi in District Court No. 2-20-cv-08545. (SB) [Entered: 08/19/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COALITION FOR THE HOMELESS is a litigant

Latest cases where UNION CITY POLICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York) is a litigant