This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2019 at 06:07:42 (UTC).

Xu v. Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang, et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Xu filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1267

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FEI XIE

XIAO WEI YANG CATERING LINKAGE IN INNER MONGOLIA CO., LTD

Not Yet Classified

FRANK XU

Defendant / Appellees

CHENG XU

INNER MONGOLIA XIAO WEI YANG USA, INC., d/b/a Xiao Wei Yang, d/b/a Little Lamb Restaurant

YONGHUA QIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank Xu

40 Wall St

New York, NY 10005-0000

Michael A. Albert

Attorney at Wolf Greenfield & Sacks PC

600 Atlantic Ave

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Hunter D. Keeton

Attorney at Wolf Greenfield & Sacks PC

600 Atlantic Ave

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Jonathan W. Lent

8 Faneuil Hall

Boston, MA 02109

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Jason E. Armiger

Attorney at Gesmer Updegrove LLP

40 Broad St

Boston, MA 02109-0000

Kevin Thomas Peters

Attorney at Gesmer Updegrove LLP

40 Broad St

Boston, MA 02109-0000

James S. Bolan

Attorney at Brecher, Wyner, Simons Fox & Bolan

100 Wells Ave.

Newton Centre, MA 02459-3210

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Laura R. Studen

Attorney at Burns & Levinson LLP

125 Summer St

Boston, MA 02110-1624

Todd J. Bennett

Attorney at Bennett & Belfort PC

24 Thorndike St, Ste 300

Cambridge, MA 02141-0000

Catherine Elizabeth Brady Murillo

Attorney at Burns & Levinson LLP

125 Summer St

Boston, MA 02110-1624

Aaron S. Welo

Attorney at Burns & Levinson LLP

125 Summer St

Boston, MA 02110-1624

Deborah J. Peckham

Attorney at Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault

125 High St.

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Sara Yevics Beccia

Attorney at Burns & Levinson LLP

125 Summer St

Boston, MA 02110-1624

Aaron Y. Silverstein

Attorney at Saunders & Silverstein LLP

14 Ceder St, Ste 224

Amesbury, MA 01913

Robert J. O'Regan

Attorney at Burns & Levinson LLP

125 Summer St

Boston, MA 02110-1624

 

Court Documents

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 221 (judgment). [19-1267] (GRC) [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:26 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu filed by Attorney Robert J. O'Regan. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1267] (RJO) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:21 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Deborah J. Peckham for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin, Aaron S. Welo for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin and Jonathan W. Lent for Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. [19-1267] (GRC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:31 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jonathan W. Lent for Not Parties Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarded to 375 Totten Pond Road Waltham, MA 02451. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:18 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 04/26/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Deborah J. Peckham for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin, Aaron S. Welo for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin and Jonathan W. Lent for Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. [19-1267]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to attach a missing document. (GRC) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarded to Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault 125 Summer Street Boston, MA 02110. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:16 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu filed by Attorney Laura R. Studen. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1267] (LRS) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:03 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Frank Xu indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:45 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2019. [19-1267] (LRS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 06:19 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 30, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:16 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Frank Xu filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:40 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Frank Xu. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:43 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jonathan W. Lent for Not Parties Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued March 20, 2019. Forwarded to 375 Totten Pond Rd Waltham, MA 02451. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/11/2019 12:46 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued March 20, 2019. Forwarded to 125 Summer St Boston, MA 02110. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/11/2019 12:50 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 30, 2019. Forwarding address unknown. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Deborah J. Peckham for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin, Aaron S. Welo for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin and Jonathan W. Lent for Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. [19-1267] (GRC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jonathan W. Lent for Not Parties Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarded to 375 Totten Pond Road Waltham, MA 02451. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Notice issued April 12, 2019. Forwarded to Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault 125 Summer Street Boston, MA 02110. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2019. [19-1267] (LRS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 06:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 04/26/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Deborah J. Peckham for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin, Aaron S. Welo for Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin and Jonathan W. Lent for Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. [19-1267]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to attach a missing document. (GRC) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jonathan W. Lent for Not Parties Xiao Wei Yang Catering Linkage In Inner Mongolia Co., Ltd and Fei Xie. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued March 20, 2019. Forwarded to 375 Totten Pond Rd Waltham, MA 02451. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/11/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Deborah J. Peckham for Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Cheng Xu and Yonghua Qin. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued March 20, 2019. Forwarded to 125 Summer St Boston, MA 02110. [19-1267] (ZN) [Entered: 04/11/2019 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Frank Xu indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Frank Xu. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Frank Xu filed by Attorney Kevin T. Peters. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (KTP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu filed by Attorney Robert J. O'Regan. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1267] (RJO) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Inner Mongolia Xiao Wei Yang USA, Inc., Yonghua Qin and Cheng Xu filed by Attorney Laura R. Studen. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1267] (LRS) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 221 (judgment). [19-1267] (GRC) [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #218) filed by Appellant Frank Xu. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/03/2019. [19-1267] (GRC) [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.