This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/21/2022 at 05:52:14 (UTC).

XR Communications, LLC v. D-Link Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 XR Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against D-Link Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1789

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

XR COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies

Defendant / Appellees

D-LINK SYSTEMS, INC.

BELKIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.

NEWO CORPORATION

ARUBA NETWORKS, INC.

ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL

ASUSTEK COMPUTER, INC.

CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.

EXTREME NETWORKS, INC.

NETGEAR, INC.

RUCKUS WIRELESS, INC.

UBIQUITI INC., aka Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.

ARUBA NETWORKS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christine H. Yang

Attorney at Law Offices of S.J. Christine Yang

17220 Newhope Street

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

Sarah Piepmeier

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

505 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Patrick Park

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert Haslam

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Square

Palo Alto, CA 94306-2112

Marcus Barber

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Daniel W. Richards

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Margaux Azurin Savee

Attorney at Polsinelli LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alice Snedeker

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Harrison J. Frahn IV

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Anupam Sharma

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/10/2022. [849761] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/27/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/27/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 05/27/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 07/12/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XR Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Extreme Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARUBA NETWORKS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Asus Computer International, Inc. is a litigant