This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/12/2022 at 06:10:08 (UTC).

XR Communications, LLC v. D-Link Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 XR Communications, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against D-Link Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1785

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

D-LINK SYSTEMS, INC.

BELKIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.

NEWO CORPORATION

ARUBA NETWORKS, INC.

NETGEAR, INC.

RUCKUS WIRELESS, INC.

UBIQUITI INC., aka Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.

ARUBA NETWORKS LLC

ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL

ASUSTEK COMPUTER, INC.

CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.

EXTREME NETWORKS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

XR COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, dba Vivato Technologies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Minna Chan

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Robert J. Gajarsa

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

800 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20004

Brian David Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Pickens

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christine H. Yang

17220 Newhope Street

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

Sarah Piepmeier

505 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Patrick Park

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert Haslam

3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Square

Palo Alto, CA 94306-2112

Jonathan K. Waldrop Esq.

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Marcus Barber

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

John Downing Esq.

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Sarah E. Piepmeier

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

505 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ryan Brodie Hawkins

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

Daniel W. Richards

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Margaux Azurin Savee

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alice Snedeker

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Harrison J. Frahn IV

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Anupam Sharma

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Official caption revised to reflect non-participation of Aruba Networks LLC, Aruba Networks, Inc., Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., NETGEAR, Inc., Newo Corporation, Ruckus Wireless, Inc. and Ubiquiti Inc. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [859982] [ALK] [Entered: 07/08/2022 03:29 PM]

#18

(#18) Entry of appearance for Marc A. Fenster; Brian D. Ledahl; Robert Gajarsa; Reza Mirzaie; Minna Chan; James N. Pickens as counsel for Appellant XR Communications, LLC. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856342] [22-1785] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 06/17/2022 08:27 PM]

#17

(#17) Docketing Statement for the Appellant XR Communications, LLC. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856341] [22-1785] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 06/17/2022 08:23 PM]

#16

(#16) Certificate of Interest for Appellant XR Communications, LLC. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856340] [22-1785] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 06/17/2022 08:19 PM]

#14

(#14) ORDER filed The above-captioned appeals shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [853712] [22-1125, 22-1785] [LMS] [Entered: 06/06/2022 11:38 AM]

#12

(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellees ASUS Computer International and Asustek Computer, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852551] [22-1785] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/27/2022 07:00 PM]

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Asustek Computer, Inc. and ASUS Computer International. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852550] [22-1785] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:59 PM]

6 #2

Docketing Statement - Attachment 1

6 #1

Docketing Statement

5 #3

Certificate of Interest - Attachment 2

5 #2

Certificate of Interest - Attachment 1

5 #1

Certificate of Interest

#4

(#13) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 4 ], Doc No. [ # 5 ], Doc No. [ # 6 ], ERROR: Appellee Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement include an incomplete case number. CORRECTION: Please include all consolidated case numbers on future filings. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [852635] [ALK] [Entered: 05/31/2022 10:12 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals 22-1785, 22-1787, 22-1789, 22-1790, 22-1791, and 22-1792. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than July 12, 2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [851338] [22-1785, 22-1787, 22-1789, 22-1790, 22-1791, 22-1792] [ALK] [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:10 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Official caption revised to reflect non-participation of Aruba Networks LLC, Aruba Networks, Inc., Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., NETGEAR, Inc., Newo Corporation, Ruckus Wireless, Inc. and Ubiquiti Inc. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [859982] [ALK] [Entered: 07/08/2022 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 16 ], ERROR: Appellant's Certificate of Interest uses a non-compliant signature format. CORRECTION: An electronic signature must follow the format prescribed by Fed. Cir. R. 25(g)(1)-(2). Please use a compliant signature format on future filings. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [856693] [ALK] [Entered: 06/22/2022 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Entry of appearance for Marc A. Fenster; Brian D. Ledahl; Robert Gajarsa; Reza Mirzaie; Minna Chan; James N. Pickens as counsel for Appellant XR Communications, LLC. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856342] [22-1785] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 06/17/2022 08:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docketing Statement for the Appellant XR Communications, LLC. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856341] [22-1785] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 06/17/2022 08:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certificate of Interest for Appellant XR Communications, LLC. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856340] [22-1785] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 06/17/2022 08:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#15) Notice to Appellant XR Communications, LLC and Appellees Aruba Networks LLC, Aruba Networks, Inc., Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., NETGEAR, Inc., Newo Corporation, Ruckus Wireless, Inc. and Ubiquiti Inc.: The record of this case indicates that no Entry of Appearance under FCR 47.3(b), Certificate of Interest under FCR 47.4, and Docketing Statement under FCR 33.1(a) have been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in dismissal or other action as deemed appropriate by the court. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [854217] [ALK] [Entered: 06/08/2022 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed The above-captioned appeals shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [853712] [22-1125, 22-1785] [LMS] [Entered: 06/06/2022 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 4 ], Doc No. [ # 5 ], Doc No. [ # 6 ], ERROR: Appellee Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement include an incomplete case number. CORRECTION: Please include all consolidated case numbers on future filings. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [852635] [ALK] [Entered: 05/31/2022 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellees ASUS Computer International and Asustek Computer, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852551] [22-1785] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/27/2022 07:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Asustek Computer, Inc. and ASUS Computer International. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852550] [22-1785] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Jonathan K. Waldrop; Marcus A. Barber; John W. Downing as counsel for Appellees ASUS Computer International and Asustek Computer, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852548] [22-1785] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Extreme Networks, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852543] [22-1785] [Daniel Richards] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Extreme Networks, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852542] [22-1785] [Daniel Richards] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Daniel W. Richards; Andrew Thomases as counsel for Appellee Extreme Networks, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852541] [22-1785] [Daniel Richards] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Cisco Systems, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852538] [22-1785] [Sarah Piepmeier] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Cisco Systems, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852535] [22-1785] [Sarah Piepmeier] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Sarah E. Piepmeier; Ryan Brodie Hawkins as counsel for Appellee Cisco Systems, Inc.. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852534] [22-1785] [Sarah Piepmeier] [Entered: 05/27/2022 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#3) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-1785 (Lead) with 22-1787, 22-1789, 22-1790, 22-1791, and 22-1792 (Members). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [851340] [22-1785, 22-1787, 22-1789, 22-1790, 22-1791, 22-1792] [ALK] [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals 22-1785, 22-1787, 22-1789, 22-1790, 22-1791, and 22-1792. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than July 12, 2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [851338] [22-1785, 22-1787, 22-1789, 22-1790, 22-1791, 22-1792] [ALK] [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/10/2022. [849744] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/27/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/27/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 05/27/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 07/12/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XR Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Extreme Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARUBA NETWORKS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Asus Computer International, Inc. is a litigant