This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/04/2022 at 06:07:59 (UTC).

Xerox Corporation v. Rimm Holdings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Xerox Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Rimm Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1500

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

XEROX CORPORATION

Defendant / Appellants

RIMM HOLDINGS, INC.

GOLD COAST, LLC, d/b/a Gold Coast Tax, LLC

JOSEPH ADJEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Morgan Thomas Dilks

Attorney at RKW LAW GROUP

10075 Red Run Boulevard

Owings Mills, MD 21117

Donald James Walsh

Attorney at RKW LAW GROUP

10075 Red Run Boulevard

Owings Mills, MD 21117

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

William A. Blagogee

Attorney at LAW FIRM OF WILLIAM BLAGOGEE, PC

7240 Lensfield Court

Alexandria, VA 22315

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-03435-GLR. Case manager: KHancock. [1001157800] [22-1500] KH [Entered: 05/05/2022 02:10 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-03435-GLR. Mailed to: William A. Blagogee. [1001157805] [22-1500] KH [Entered: 05/05/2022 02:13 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald J. Walsh for Xerox Corporation. [1001160737] [22-1500] Donald Walsh [Entered: 05/11/2022 12:51 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Xerox Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001160741] [22-1500] Donald Walsh [Entered: 05/11/2022 12:52 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Morgan T. Dilks for Xerox Corporation. [1001160743] [22-1500] Morgan Dilks [Entered: 05/11/2022 12:53 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William A. Blagogee for Joseph Adjei, Gold Coast, LLC and Rimm Holdings, Inc.. [1001164352] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:44 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joseph Adjei, Gold Coast, LLC and Rimm Holdings, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001164373] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:20 PM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Joseph Adjei, Gold Coast, LLC and Rimm Holdings, Inc... [1001164374] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:23 PM]

#9

(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001164583] Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/27/2022. Response Brief due 07/27/2022. [22-1500] KH [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:29 PM]

#10

(#10) BRIEF by Joseph Adjei, Gold Coast, LLC and Rimm Holdings, Inc.. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001184189] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 06/27/2022 05:11 PM]

#11

(#11) JOINT APPENDIX by Rimm Holdings, Inc., Gold Coast, LLC and Joseph Adjei. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001184193] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 06/27/2022 05:13 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT APPENDIX by Rimm Holdings, Inc., Gold Coast, LLC and Joseph Adjei. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001184193] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 06/27/2022 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF by Joseph Adjei, Gold Coast, LLC and Rimm Holdings, Inc.. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001184189] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 06/27/2022 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001164583] Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/27/2022. Response Brief due 07/27/2022. [22-1500] KH [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Joseph Adjei, Gold Coast, LLC and Rimm Holdings, Inc... [1001164374] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joseph Adjei, Gold Coast, LLC and Rimm Holdings, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001164373] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 05/18/2022 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William A. Blagogee for Joseph Adjei, Gold Coast, LLC and Rimm Holdings, Inc.. [1001164352] [22-1500] William Blagogee [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Morgan T. Dilks for Xerox Corporation. [1001160743] [22-1500] Morgan Dilks [Entered: 05/11/2022 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Xerox Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001160741] [22-1500] Donald Walsh [Entered: 05/11/2022 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald J. Walsh for Xerox Corporation. [1001160737] [22-1500] Donald Walsh [Entered: 05/11/2022 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-03435-GLR. Mailed to: William A. Blagogee. [1001157805] [22-1500] KH [Entered: 05/05/2022 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:20-cv-03435-GLR. Case manager: KHancock. [1001157800] [22-1500] KH [Entered: 05/05/2022 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold Coast Cab Company is a litigant

Latest cases where XEROX CORPORATION is a litigant