This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/14/2021 at 06:31:52 (UTC).

WSOU Investments LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 WSOU Investments LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1067

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WSOU INVESTMENTS LLC, dba Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendant / Appellee

GOOGLE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James Etheridge

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 E Southlake Boulevard, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Israel Sasha Mayergoyz

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-1692

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#3

(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals (22-2066, 22-1067). Appellants opening brief is due no later than December 14, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [808328] [22-1066, 22-1067] [JCW] [Entered: 10/26/2021 04:40 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-1066 Lead with 22-1067 Member Case. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [808329] [22-1066, 22-1067] [JCW] [Entered: 10/26/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals (22-2066, 22-1067). Appellants opening brief is due no later than December 14, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [808328] [22-1066, 22-1067] [JCW] [Entered: 10/26/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/14/2021. [806032] Entry of Appearance is due on 10/29/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/29/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 10/29/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 12/14/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 10/15/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant