This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/14/2021 at 06:11:18 (UTC).

WSOU Investments LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 WSOU Investments LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1064

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WSOU INVESTMENTS LLC, dba Brazos Licensing and Development

Defendant / Appellee

GOOGLE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Etheridge

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 E Southlake Boulevard, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Nathan K. Cummings

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 East Southlake Boulevard

Southlake, TX 76092

Brian Matthew Koide

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 East Southlake Boulevard

Southlake, TX 76092

Ryan S. Loveless

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 E Southlake Boulevard, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Brett Mangrum

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 E Southlake Boulevard, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Jeffrey A. Stephens

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 East Southlake Boulevard

Southlake, TX 76092

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Israel Sasha Mayergoyz

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-1692

Tharan Gregory Lanier

Attorney at Jones Day

Silicon Valley Office, 1755 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Tracy A. Stitt

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Jennifer L. Swize

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for I. Sasha Mayergoyz; T. Greg Lanier; Tracy A. Stitt as counsel for Appellee Google LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809150] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 10/29/2021 01:42 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Google LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809151] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 10/29/2021 01:43 PM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Google LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809153] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 10/29/2021 01:45 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for James L. Etheridge; Jeffrey A. Stephens; Ryan S. Loveless; Brett A. Mangrum; Brian Koide; Nathan Cummings as counsel for Appellant WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809266] [22-1064] [Jeffrey Stephens] [Entered: 10/29/2021 06:29 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellant WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809267] [22-1064] [Jeffrey Stephens] [Entered: 10/29/2021 06:30 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809268] [22-1064] [Jeffrey Stephens] [Entered: 10/29/2021 06:31 PM]

#9

(#9) MOTION of Appellant WSOU Investments LLC to extend the time to 02/14/2022 to file brief. Service: 12/07/2021 by email. [816959] [22-1064] [Jeffrey Stephens] [Entered: 12/07/2021 05:41 PM]

#11

(#11) Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Google LLC. Service: 12/10/2021 by email. [817708] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:58 AM]

#12

(#12) MOTION of Appellee Google LLC for limited remand. Service: 12/10/2021 by email. [817711] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:59 AM]

#13

(#13) Entry of appearance for Jennifer L. Swize as counsel for Google LLC. Service: 12/10/2021 by email. [817753] [22-1064] [Jennifer Swize] [Entered: 12/10/2021 01:01 PM]

#14

(#14) RESPONSE of Appellant WSOU Investments LLC to Doc No. [ # 12 ]. Service: 12/10/2021 by email. [817875] [22-1064] [Nathan Cummings] [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:08 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE of Appellant WSOU Investments LLC to Doc No. [ # 12 ]. Service: 12/10/2021 by email. [817875] [22-1064] [Nathan Cummings] [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Entry of appearance for Jennifer L. Swize as counsel for Google LLC. Service: 12/10/2021 by email. [817753] [22-1064] [Jennifer Swize] [Entered: 12/10/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION of Appellee Google LLC for limited remand. Service: 12/10/2021 by email. [817711] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Google LLC. Service: 12/10/2021 by email. [817708] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 12/10/2021 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant WSOU Investments LLC. The opening brief is due 02/14/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [817002] [JCW] [Entered: 12/08/2021 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION of Appellant WSOU Investments LLC to extend the time to 02/14/2022 to file brief. Service: 12/07/2021 by email. [816959] [22-1064] [Jeffrey Stephens] [Entered: 12/07/2021 05:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellant WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809268] [22-1064] [Jeffrey Stephens] [Entered: 10/29/2021 06:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellant WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809267] [22-1064] [Jeffrey Stephens] [Entered: 10/29/2021 06:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for James L. Etheridge; Jeffrey A. Stephens; Ryan S. Loveless; Brett A. Mangrum; Brian Koide; Nathan Cummings as counsel for Appellant WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809266] [22-1064] [Jeffrey Stephens] [Entered: 10/29/2021 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Google LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809153] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 10/29/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Google LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809151] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 10/29/2021 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for I. Sasha Mayergoyz; T. Greg Lanier; Tracy A. Stitt as counsel for Appellee Google LLC. Service: 10/29/2021 by email. [809150] [22-1064] [Israel Mayergoyz] [Entered: 10/29/2021 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel: 22-1063, 22-1064, 22-1065, 22-1066, 22-1067. [808326] [22-1063, 22-1064, 22-1065, 22-1066] [JCW] [Entered: 10/26/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/14/2021. [806009] Entry of Appearance is due on 10/29/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/29/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 10/29/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 12/14/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 10/15/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracy Stitt