This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/05/2022 at 06:02:13 (UTC).

Wright v. Lumpkin

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 Wright filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Lumpkin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-40414

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

Kevin Rashawn Wright

Tennessee Colony, TX 75884-0000

Respondent / Appellee

Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Kevin Rashawn Wright

Attorney at CID Coffield Prison

2661 Fm 2054

Tennessee Colony, TX 75884-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Edward Larry Marshall

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Kevin Rashawn Wright [22-40414] (ABT) [Entered: 07/07/2022 12:45 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9893282-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/01/2022 for Appellant Kevin Rashawn Wright [22-40414] (SDH) [Entered: 07/15/2022 09:23 AM]

Open Document

LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising that docketing notice was prematurely issued. [22-40414] (SDH) [Entered: 07/18/2022 11:33 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketFEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Kevin Rashawn Wright. [22-40414] (DLM) [Entered: 07/18/2022 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising that docketing notice was prematurely issued. [22-40414] (SDH) [Entered: 07/18/2022 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9893282-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/01/2022 for Appellant Kevin Rashawn Wright [22-40414] (SDH) [Entered: 07/15/2022 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Kevin Rashawn Wright [22-40414] (ABT) [Entered: 07/07/2022 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Larry Marshall