Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 06:08:40 (UTC).

Wray v. Home Depot USA

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Wray filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Home Depot USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10374

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Norma Wray

Defendant / Appellee

Home Depot USA, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dan Stewart Boyd Esq.

Attorney at Boyd & Stapleton

P.O. Box 803596

Dallas, TX 75380

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Kristin Snyder Higgins

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

8117 Preston Road, Preston Commons, W.

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Restricted Document #3

BR-5 E-Filers Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Proposed Sufficient Brief

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document

DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the exhibit to brief received from Appellant Ms. Norma Wray because attachments to briefs are not allowed without leave of court. [21-10374] (CBW) [Entered: 06/10/2021 04:00 PM]

Open Document #2

QCBR-5 E-Filers Letter

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/16/2021 for Appellant Norma Wray. [21-10374] (MRW) [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:05 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kristin Snyder Higgins for Home Depot USA, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10374] (Kristin Snyder Higgins ) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:49 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Dan Stewart Boyd, Esq. for Ms. Norma Wray for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10374] (Dan Stewart Boyd ) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:45 AM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Ms. Norma Wrayfor the Court to process. Date of service: 05/06/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Boyd; Attorney for Appellee: Higgins. [21-10374] (Dan Stewart Boyd ) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:27 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9557154-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 05/07/2021 for Appellant Norma Wray. [21-10374] (SEP) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:20 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Norma Wray [21-10374] (LEF) [Entered: 04/14/2021 04:31 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appendix filed using the letter filed event. received from Appellant Ms. Norma Wray because record excerpts must be filed using the record excerpts filed event and must comply with the guidelines set out in the court's June 10, 2021, letter. [21-10374] (CBW) [Entered: 06/11/2021 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellant Ms. Norma Wray in 21-10374 [ # 9593719-2 ] Brief has been deemed insufficient. Additional corrections required: attachments are not allowed without leave of court. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. Sufficient Brief deadline updated to 06/25/2021 for Appellant Norma Wray [21-10374] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellant Ms. Norma Wray [ # 9593719-2 ] Date of service: 06/11/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Boyd; Attorney for Appellee: Higgins [21-10374] (Dan Stewart Boyd ) [Entered: 06/11/2021 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appendix received from Appellant Ms. Norma Wray because Incorrect filing event was used. [21-10374] (CBW) [Entered: 06/10/2021 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the exhibit to brief received from Appellant Ms. Norma Wray because attachments to briefs are not allowed without leave of court. [21-10374] (CBW) [Entered: 06/10/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED Record Excerpts due on 06/24/2021 for Appellant Norma Wray [21-10374] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED Additionally the Brief requires Standard of Review is required. Attachments to the brief are not allowed without leave of court.. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 06/24/2021 for Appellant Norma Wray.. Appellee's Brief due on 07/12/2021 for Appellee Home Depot USA, Incorporated [21-10374] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Norma Wray. Date of service: 06/10/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Boyd; Attorney for Appellee: Higgins [21-10374] (Dan Stewart Boyd ) [Entered: 06/10/2021 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kristin Snyder Higgins for Appellee Home Depot USA, Incorporated in 21-10374 [21-10374] (CBW) [Entered: 05/07/2021 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Dan Stewart Boyd for Appellant Norma Wray in 21-10374 [21-10374] (CBW) [Entered: 05/07/2021 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/16/2021 for Appellant Norma Wray. [21-10374] (MRW) [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-10374] (MRW) [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:19-CV-2785. Electronic ROA due on 05/21/2021. [21-10374] (CBW) [Entered: 05/06/2021 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Norma Wray advising transcript unnecessary Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-10374] (CBW) [Entered: 05/06/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kristin Snyder Higgins for Home Depot USA, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10374] (Kristin Snyder Higgins ) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Dan Stewart Boyd, Esq. for Ms. Norma Wray for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10374] (Dan Stewart Boyd ) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Ms. Norma Wrayfor the Court to process. Date of service: 05/06/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Boyd; Attorney for Appellee: Higgins. [21-10374] (Dan Stewart Boyd ) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9557154-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 05/07/2021 for Appellant Norma Wray. [21-10374] (SEP) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Norma Wray [21-10374] (LEF) [Entered: 04/14/2021 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin Snyder Higgins