This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:29 (UTC).

Worsten Andrews v. City of Pittsburg, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Worsten Andrews filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Pittsburg. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16399

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

WORSTEN MACK ANDREWS

Defendant / Appellants

MICHAEL KEEFE, individually and in his Official Capacity as a Police Officer for the City of Pittsburg

CITY OF PITTSBURG, a municipal corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Brittany Halley Hendrix-Smith

Attorney at Law Office of Brittany Hendrix-Smith

535 Main Street

Martinez, CA 94553

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Noah G. Blechman Esquire

Attorney at McNamara, Ney, Beatty, Slattery, Borges & Ambacher, LLP

3480 Buskirk Avenue, Suite 250

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Amy S. Rothman Esquire

Attorney at McNamara Law Firm

3480 Buskirk Avenue, Suite 250

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellee Worsten Mack Andrews Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/21/2019. [11370539] [19-16399] (Hendrix-Smith, Brittany) [Entered: 07/21/2019 05:22 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SJS) Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 9 ] ) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11424124] (JPD) [Entered: 09/06/2019 04:39 PM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #6

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/16/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11377143] (CL) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:53 PM]

1 #3

Mediation Questionnaire Instructions

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The dial-in assessment conference scheduled for 8/16/19 is CANCELED. By 09/30/2019, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [11398478] (CL) [Entered: 08/15/2019 12:17 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellants City of Pittsburg and Michael Keefe Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 08/28/2019. [11413950] [19-16399] (Rothman, Amy) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:48 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants City of Pittsburg and Michael Keefe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371806] [19-16399] (Rothman, Amy) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:10 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KWH): In addition to all other issues the parties wish to raise in their briefs, the parties shall address the basis of this courts jurisdiction over this appeal. See Maropulos v. Cty. of Los Angeles, 560 F.3d 974, 975 (9th Cir. 2009) (per curiam) ([A]n order denying qualified immunity on the ground that a genuine issue of material fact exists is not a final, immediately appealable order.); Rodriguez v. Cty. of Los Angeles, 891 F.3d 776, 791 (9th Cir. 2018). The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. [11371802] (RT) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:09 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SJS) Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 9 ] ) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11424124] (JPD) [Entered: 09/06/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) Appellants City of Pittsburg and Michael Keefe Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 08/28/2019. [11413950] [19-16399] (Rothman, Amy) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The dial-in assessment conference scheduled for 8/16/19 is CANCELED. By 09/30/2019, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [11398478] (CL) [Entered: 08/15/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/16/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11377143] (CL) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11372551][19-16399] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants City of Pittsburg and Michael Keefe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371806] [19-16399] (Rothman, Amy) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KWH): In addition to all other issues the parties wish to raise in their briefs, the parties shall address the basis of this courts jurisdiction over this appeal. See Maropulos v. Cty. of Los Angeles, 560 F.3d 974, 975 (9th Cir. 2009) (per curiam) ([A]n order denying qualified immunity on the ground that a genuine issue of material fact exists is not a final, immediately appealable order.); Rodriguez v. Cty. of Los Angeles, 891 F.3d 776, 791 (9th Cir. 2018). The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. [11371802] (RT) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11370587][19-16399] (AD) [Entered: 07/21/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellee Worsten Mack Andrews Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/21/2019. [11370539] [19-16399] (Hendrix-Smith, Brittany) [Entered: 07/21/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/23/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/15/2019. Transcript due 09/16/2019. Appellants City of Pittsburg and Michael Keefe opening brief due 10/24/2019. Appellee Worsten Mack Andrews answering brief due 11/25/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11365489] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.