This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/08/2022 at 06:08:13 (UTC).

Woods v. Collins, et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Woods filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Collins. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1340

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellant

R. SUSAN WOODS

Hadley, MA 01035-0160

Appellees

JOSEPH B. COLLINS, Chapter 7 Trustee

46 Center Sq

East Longmeadow, MA 01028

GOLDMAN SACHS MORTGAGE COMPANY

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., as Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2005-FR2 Mortgage Pass - Through Certificates, Series 2005-FR2

Trustee

RICHARD KING, US Trustee

446 Main St, 14Th Flr

Worcester, MA 01608-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

R. Susan Woods

43 West St, Po Box 160

Hadley, MA 01035-0160

Appellee Attorneys

Joseph B. Collins

Attorney at Fitzgerald Law PC

46 Center Sq

East Longmeadow, MA 01028

Andrea M. O'Connor

Attorney at Fitzgerald Law Group

120 Exchange St

Portland, ME 04101

Marcus Pratt

Attorney at Korde & Assoc PC

900 Chelmsford St, Ste 3102

Lowell, MA 01851

Jeffrey C. Ankrom

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2800 Financial Plaza

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Trustee Attorney

Richard King

Attorney at US Trustee's Office

446 Main St, 14Th Flr

Worcester, MA 01608-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Open Document #1

Objection to Motion to Qualify Appeals as Proceeding in Good Faith

Open Document

ORDER entered: In an order entered on March 31, 2022 in No. 1:21-cv-10754-MGM (D. Mass.), the district court certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A), that this appeal is not taken in good faith. Appellant's motion challenging the district court's certification and to proceed in forma pauperis, pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5), is pending before this court. [22-1340] (ALW) [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:11 PM]

Open Document #2

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

certificate of service

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

CERTIFICATE of service for to qualify appeals as proceeding in good faith and request for investigation [ # 6499576-2 ] filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1152, 22-1340. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1152, 22-1340] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RSW) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:58 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to qualify appeals as proceeding in good faith and request for investigation filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1152, 22-1340. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1152, 22-1340] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RSW) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:55 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE of service for [ # 6495889-2 ], [ # 6495448-2 ], [6495324-2], [ # 6493003-2 ], [ # 6483513-2 ] filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1340, 22-1152. Served on 06/01/2022. [22-1340, 22-1152] (RSW) [Entered: 06/01/2022 01:38 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

MOTION to consolidate cases 22-1340 and 22-1152 filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1340, 22-1152. Served on 05/14/2022. [22-1340, 22-1152] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RSW) [Entered: 05/14/2022 02:06 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1340, 22-1152 indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 05/14/2022. [22-1340, 22-1152] (RSW) [Entered: 05/14/2022 01:09 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Served on 05/14/2022. [22-1340] (RSW) [Entered: 05/14/2022 12:52 AM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION to requests for sanctions filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1152, 22-1340 to [ # 6502651-2 ], [ # 6501818-2 ]. Served on 06/27/2022. [22-1152, 22-1340] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RSW) [Entered: 06/27/2022 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION to Motion to Qualify Appeals as Proceeding in Good Faith filed by Appellee Joseph B. Collins [ # 6499576-2 ], Motion for leave to file extra pages [ # 6499579-2 ], Notice of addendum to the motion to qualify appeals as proceeding in good faith and request for investigation [ # 6499578-2 ]. Served on 06/17/2022. [22-1340] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JBC) [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered: In an order entered on March 31, 2022 in No. 1:21-cv-10754-MGM (D. Mass.), the district court certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A), that this appeal is not taken in good faith. Appellant's motion challenging the district court's certification and to proceed in forma pauperis, pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5), is pending before this court. [22-1340] (ALW) [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to file extra pages filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1152, 22-1340. Served on 06/03/2022. [22-1152, 22-1340] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RSW) [Entered: 06/03/2022 12:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of addendum to the motion to qualify appeals as proceeding in good faith and request for investigation [ # 6499576-2 ] by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1152, 22-1340. Served on 06/03/2022. [22-1152, 22-1340] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect and docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (RSW) [Entered: 06/03/2022 12:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE of service for to qualify appeals as proceeding in good faith and request for investigation [ # 6499576-2 ] filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1152, 22-1340. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1152, 22-1340] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RSW) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to qualify appeals as proceeding in good faith and request for investigation filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1152, 22-1340. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1152, 22-1340] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RSW) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE of service for [ # 6495889-2 ], [ # 6495448-2 ], [6495324-2], [ # 6493003-2 ], [ # 6483513-2 ] filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1340, 22-1152. Served on 06/01/2022. [22-1340, 22-1152] (RSW) [Entered: 06/01/2022 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT in support of motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 6495448-2 ] filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Certificate of service was not included. [22-1340] (ALW) [Entered: 05/17/2022 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to consolidate cases 22-1340 and 22-1152 filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1340, 22-1152. Served on 05/14/2022. [22-1340, 22-1152] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RSW) [Entered: 05/14/2022 02:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods in 22-1340, 22-1152 indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 05/14/2022. [22-1340, 22-1152] (RSW) [Entered: 05/14/2022 01:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Served on 05/14/2022. [22-1340] (RSW) [Entered: 05/14/2022 12:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Served on 05/14/2022. [22-1340] (RSW) [Entered: 05/14/2022 12:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Joseph B. Collins filed by Attorney Joseph B. Collins, Trustee. Served on 05/11/2022. [22-1340] (JBC) [Entered: 05/11/2022 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #91) filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Fee due 05/23/2022. [22-1340] (ALW) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOSEPH B. COLLINS, Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITIZED ASSET BACKED RECEIVABLES LLC TRUST 2005-HE1 MORT PASS-THROUGH CERT SERIES 2005-HE1 is a litigant

Latest cases where Goldman Sachs & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard King