This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/03/2021 at 06:01:00 (UTC).

Woods v. Collins

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 Woods filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Collins. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1993

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellant

R. SUSAN WOODS

Hadley, MA 01035-0160

Appellee

JOSEPH B. COLLINS, Trustee

101 State St.

Springfield, MA 01103-0000

Trustee

RICHARD KING, Assistant US Trustee

446 Main St, 14Th Flr

Worcester, MA 01608-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

R. Susan Woods

43 West St, Po Box 160

Hadley, MA 01035-0160

Appellee Attorneys

Joseph B. Collins

Attorney at Hendel & Collins, PC

101 State St.

Springfield, MA 01103-0000

Andrea O'Connor

Attorney at Hendel & Collins PC

101 State St

Springfield, MA 01103-0000

Trustee Attorney

Richard King

Attorney at US Trustee's Office

446 Main St, 14Th Flr

Worcester, MA 01608-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Restricted Document #2

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Addendum to Obj. to Motion to Dismiss

Open Document #1

Objection to Motion to Dismiss

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellee Joseph B. Collins to motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 6387507-2 ], and for determination that appeal is taken in good faith [ # 6387507-3 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/22/2020. [20-1993]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JBC) [Entered: 12/22/2020 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed in forma pauperis and for determination that appeal is taken in good faith, and RESPONSE to the court's order dated November 9, 2020 [ # 6380532-2 ] filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2020. [20-1993]. CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (RSW) [Entered: 12/09/2020 11:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods to motion to dismiss case [ # 6379810-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 11/25/2020. [20-1993] (RSW) [Entered: 11/25/2020 11:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketRequest to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods is pending in the Court of Appeals. [20-1993] (GAK) [Entered: 11/17/2020 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file response filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Response to Motion to Dismiss due 11/25/2020 for R. Susan Woods. [20-1993] (CMP) [Entered: 11/16/2020 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Certificate of service dated 11/15/2020. [20-1993] (RSW) [Entered: 11/15/2020 11:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: Upon consideration, appellant R. Susan Woods' motion for an exemption from electronic public access fees is denied. [20-1993] (CMP) [Entered: 11/12/2020 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Joseph B. Collins filed by Attorney Joseph B. Collins. Certificate of service dated 11/10/2020. [20-1993] (JBC) [Entered: 11/10/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered: In an order entered on October 22, 2020 in No. 3:20-cv-30060-LTS (D. Mass.), the district court certified pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A) that the appeal is not taken in good faith. If appellant seeks to challenge the district court's certification, she must file a motion pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5), provided that she do so before December 9, 2020 . Accordingly, on or before December 9, 2020 , appellant must either pay the $505 filing fee to the district court or file a motion in this court pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). Failure to take either action will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of prosecution. [20-1993] (MNH) [Entered: 11/09/2020 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellee Joseph B. Collins to motion [ # 6379742-2 ], motion [ # 6379761-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 11/06/2020. [20-1993] (JBC) [Entered: 11/06/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER sent to Appellant R. Susan Woods in response to her recent correspondence dated October 20, 2020. [20-1993] (CMP) [Entered: 11/06/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellee Joseph B. Collins. Certificate of service dated 11/05/2020. [20-1993] (JBC) [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed in forma pauperis with affidavit filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1993] (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to exempt petitioner from electronic public access fees filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1993] (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of non filing of transripts filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1993] (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to file electronically filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1993] (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 50. [20-1993] (MNH) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #45) filed by Appellant R. Susan Woods. Fee due 11/18/2020. [20-1993] (MNH) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOSEPH B. COLLINS, Trustee is a litigant