This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/15/2022 at 06:05:48 (UTC).

Woodruff v. Caris MPI

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Woodruff filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Caris MPI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11249

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Joseph Woodruff

Erica Jobe

Mandee Katz

Scott Babjak

Defendant / Appellees

Caris MPI, Incorporated

Caris Life Sciences, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Leo Lanza

Attorney at Vethan Law Firm

820 Ih-10, W., Fountainhead Tower

San Antonio, TX 78230

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sherry L. Travers

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2001 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Mark Anthony Flores

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2001 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

David B. Jordan

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1301 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Kimberly Rives Miers

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

100 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

Michael Scott McDonald

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2001 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Scott Babjak, Ms. Erica Jobe, Ms. Mandee Katz and Mr. Joseph Woodruff [21-11249] (RAJ) [Entered: 12/17/2021 06:18 PM]

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Jeff Foster. [21-11249] (Jeff Foster ) [Entered: 12/21/2021 02:27 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9741171-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/06/2022 for Appellants Scott Babjak, Erica Jobe, Mandee Katz and Joseph Woodruff [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 12/22/2021 04:56 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11249] (Michael Scott McDonald ) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:40 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Sherry L. Travers for Caris Life Sciences, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-11249] (Sherry L. Travers ) [Entered: 12/23/2021 03:26 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-11249] (Charles M.R. Vethan ) [Entered: 12/23/2021 05:04 PM]

Open Document

DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form filed by Michael McDonald in light of appearance form being a duplicate for attorney Michael McDonald. The image was replaced for the original appearance form. [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 12/27/2021 11:56 AM]

Open Document

Attorney Mr. Joseph Leo Lanza for Appellants Mr. Joseph Woodruff, Ms. Erica Jobe, Ms. Mandee Katz and Mr. Scott Babjak is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [21-11249] (BF) [Entered: 12/27/2021 08:56 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/15/2022 for Appellants Scott Babjak, Erica Jobe, Mandee Katz and Joseph Woodruff. [21-11249] (CMB) [Entered: 01/06/2022 01:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11249] (Kimberly Rives Miers ) [Entered: 01/11/2022 10:35 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11249] (David B. Jordan ) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:37 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11249] (Mark Anthony Flores ) [Entered: 01/12/2022 05:12 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Scott Babjak, Ms. Erica Jobe, Ms. Mandee Katz and Mr. Joseph Woodruff for filing Requesting a Level 1 Extension for Appellants to file Brief until 02/14/2022 [21-11249] (Joseph Leo Lanza ) [Entered: 02/14/2022 12:56 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Scott Babjak, Ms. Erica Jobe, Ms. Mandee Katz and Mr. Joseph Woodruff. Extension Granted to and including 02/28/2022. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 02/28/2022 for Appellants Scott Babjak, Erica Jobe, Mandee Katz and Joseph Woodruff [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 02/14/2022 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Scott Babjak, Ms. Erica Jobe, Ms. Mandee Katz and Mr. Joseph Woodruff for filing Requesting a Level 1 Extension for Appellants to file Brief until 02/14/2022 [21-11249] (Joseph Leo Lanza ) [Entered: 02/14/2022 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Mark Anthony Flores for party(s) Appellee Caris MPI, Incorporated Appellee Caris Life Sciences, Incorporated, in case 21-11249 [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 01/13/2022 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11249] (Mark Anthony Flores ) [Entered: 01/12/2022 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David B. Jordan for party(s) Appellee Caris MPI, Incorporated Appellee Caris Life Sciences, Incorporated, in case 21-11249 [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 01/12/2022 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kimberly Rives Miers for party(s) Appellee Caris MPI, Incorporated Appellee Caris Life Sciences, Incorporated, in case 21-11249 [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 01/12/2022 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11249] (David B. Jordan ) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11249] (Kimberly Rives Miers ) [Entered: 01/11/2022 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/15/2022 for Appellants Scott Babjak, Erica Jobe, Mandee Katz and Joseph Woodruff. [21-11249] (CMB) [Entered: 01/06/2022 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-11249] (CMB) [Entered: 01/06/2022 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sherry L. Travers for Appellee Caris Life Sciences, Incorporated in 21-11249, by Attorney(s) Sherry L. Travers for party(s) Appellee Caris MPI, Incorporated, in case 21-11249 [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 12/27/2021 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Mr. Joseph Leo Lanza for Appellants Mr. Joseph Woodruff, Ms. Erica Jobe, Ms. Mandee Katz and Mr. Scott Babjak is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [21-11249] (BF) [Entered: 12/27/2021 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form filed by Michael McDonald in light of appearance form being a duplicate for attorney Michael McDonald. The image was replaced for the original appearance form. [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 12/27/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-11249] (Charles M.R. Vethan ) [Entered: 12/23/2021 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Sherry L. Travers for Caris Life Sciences, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-11249] (Sherry L. Travers ) [Entered: 12/23/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Scott McDonald for party(s) Appellee Caris MPI, Incorporated Appellee Caris Life Sciences, Incorporated, in case 21-11249 [21-11249] (CAS) [Entered: 12/23/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11249] (Michael Scott McDonald ) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9741171-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/06/2022 for Appellants Scott Babjak, Erica Jobe, Mandee Katz and Joseph Woodruff [21-11249] (LEF) [Entered: 12/22/2021 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Jeff Foster. [21-11249] (Jeff Foster ) [Entered: 12/21/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Scott Babjak, Ms. Erica Jobe, Ms. Mandee Katz and Mr. Joseph Woodruff [21-11249] (RAJ) [Entered: 12/17/2021 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caris Life Sciences Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where CARIS MPI, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherry L Travers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Scott McDonald