Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2020 at 06:17:37 (UTC).

Wisehart v. Wisehart, et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Wisehart filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Wisehart,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1198

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ARTHUR DODSON WISEHART

CHARLES WINSTON WISEHART

WISEHART SPRINGS INN

Plaintiff / Appellant

ARTHUR MCKEE WISEHART

Hoboken, NJ 07030

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Mark Apelman

Attorney at Boyle Apelman

1775 Sherman Street, Suite 1425

Denver, CO 80203

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Arthur McKee Wisehart

229 Court Street

Hoboken, NJ 07030

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10754627] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellant's motion for judicial notice [ # 10754600-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Any response and reply are also referred to the merits panel. Served on 07/13/2020. [20-1198] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:05 PM]

Open Document

[10754600] Appellant's motion for judicial notice filed by Arthur McKee Wisehart. Served on 07/11/2020. Manner of Service: FedEx. [20-1198] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:32 PM]

Open Document

[10754541] Appellant brief filed by Arthur McKee Wisehart. Original and 4 copies. Served on 07/11/2020 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? y. Appellee's brief due 08/13/2020 for Arthur Dodson Wisehart, Wisehart Springs Inn and Charles Winston Wisehart. [20-1198] [Entered: 07/13/2020 01:30 PM]

Open Restricted Document #6

ROA Vol. 6 - transcripts

Open Restricted Document #5

ROA Vol. 5 - sealed pleadings

Open Restricted Document #4

ROA Vol. 4 - pleadings

Open Restricted Document #3

ROA Vol. 3 - pleadings

Open Restricted Document #2

ROA Vol. 2 - pleadings

Open Restricted Document #1

ROA Vol. 1 - pleadings

Open Document

[10746767] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant's motion to correct caption filed by Appellant Arthur McKee Wisehart. Served on 06/11/2020. [20-1198] Please see order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:23 AM]

Open Document

[10745396] Appellant's motion filed by Arthur McKee Wisehart for corrections regarding file date, caption. Served on 06/04/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:46 AM]

Open Document

[10745386] Entry of appearance filed by Arthur McKee Wisehart. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/04/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1198] [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:37 AM]

Open Document

[10745032] Amended notice of appeal filed. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/04/2020 09:58 AM]

Open Document #2

letter to appellant

Open Document #1

Pro se pleading

Open Document

[10744210] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Apelman for Arthur Dodson Wisehart, Charles Winston Wisehart and Wisehart Springs Inn. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:57 PM]

Open Document

[10743932] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and notice of appearance due on 07/13/2020 for Arthur McKee Wisehart. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 06/22/2020. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:52 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10754627] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellant's motion for judicial notice [ # 10754600-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Any response and reply are also referred to the merits panel. Served on 07/13/2020. [20-1198] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10754600] Appellant's motion for judicial notice filed by Arthur McKee Wisehart. Served on 07/11/2020. Manner of Service: FedEx. [20-1198] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10754541] Appellant brief filed by Arthur McKee Wisehart. Original and 4 copies. Served on 07/11/2020 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? y. Appellee's brief due 08/13/2020 for Arthur Dodson Wisehart, Wisehart Springs Inn and Charles Winston Wisehart. [20-1198] [Entered: 07/13/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10747767] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 6, Comments: Vols 1-4, pleadings; Vol. 5, sealed pleadings; Vol. 6, transcripts. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10746767] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant's motion to correct caption filed by Appellant Arthur McKee Wisehart. Served on 06/11/2020. [20-1198] Please see order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745396] Appellant's motion filed by Arthur McKee Wisehart for corrections regarding file date, caption. Served on 06/04/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745386] Entry of appearance filed by Arthur McKee Wisehart. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/04/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1198] [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745032] Amended notice of appeal filed. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/04/2020 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745280] Correspondence from appellant regarding caption received from but not filed. Response letter sent to appellant. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/05/2020 07:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10744210] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Apelman for Arthur Dodson Wisehart, Charles Winston Wisehart and Wisehart Springs Inn. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docket[10744199] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark Apelman for Appellees Wisehart Springs Inn, Arthur Dodson Wisehart and Charles Winston Wisehart for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/01/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1198] MA [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743932] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and notice of appearance due on 07/13/2020 for Arthur McKee Wisehart. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 06/22/2020. [20-1198] [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743569] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/28/2020 Notice of appearance due on 06/11/2020 for Arthur Dodson Wisehart, Charles Winston Wisehart and Wisehart Springs Inn. Notice of appearance due on 06/29/2020 for Arthur McKee Wisehart. [20-1198] [Entered: 05/28/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WISEHART SPRINGS INN, INC. is a litigant