This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2020 at 06:00:27 (UTC).

Wiscovitch-Rentas v. Ortiz-Colon

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 Wiscovitch-Rentas filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Ortiz-Colon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1207

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Defendants

JANET NAVARRETE

EMILY AREAN

JOSE ALBERTO SOSA-LLORENS

San Juan, PR

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

DIANA LOZANO

PEDRO J. MANZANO-YATES

San Juan, PR 00936

EDUARDO M. NEGRON NAVAS

MARIA SANTOS

WALESKA MORA-ALDEBOL

JUAN C. PEREZ-OTERO

CARMEN JUARBE

CHARLES BIMBELA

MARY DEAL

AON RISK SOLUTIONS OF PUERTO RICO, INC.

JOSE A. SILVA-COFRESI

MARIA I. SANTOS RIVERA

JOSE A. ACOSTA GRUBB

VIVIAN REYES

Plaintiff / Appellee

NOREEN WISCOVITCH RENTAS, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Debtor, Fiddler Gonzalez & Rodriguez, P.S.C.

San Juan, PR 00918

Defendant / Appellant

RICARDO L. ORTIZ-COLON

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Carmen D. Conde Torres

Attorney at Colon Conde & Mirandes LLC

1431 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 401

San Juan, PR 00907-4033

Luisa Sussette Valle-Castro

Attorney at Colon Conde & Mirandes LLC

1431 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 401

San Juan, PR 00907-4033

Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens

Attorney at DLA Piper LLC

500 De La Tanca St, Ochoa Bldg.

San Juan, PR

Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez

Attorney at Guzman & Rodriguez-Lopez Law Offices

Po Box 70250

San Juan, PR 00936

Jesus E. Cuza Abdala

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

701 Bricknell Ave, Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131-0000

Robert W. Davis Jr.

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

200 S. Orange Ave, Suite 2600

Orlando, FL 32801

Joaquin Alemany

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

701 Bricknell Ave, Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131-0000

Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte

Attorney at Silva-Cofresi Manzano & Padro LLC

Po Box 4187

San Juan, PR 00936

Pedro J. Manzano-Yates

Attorney at Silva-Cofresi Manzano & Padro LLC

Po Box 4187

San Juan, PR 00936

Jorge I. Peirats

Attorney at Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC

208 Ponce De Leon Ave, Popular Center, 19Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Alfonso L. Perez-Diaz

Attorney at Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC

208 Ponce De Leon Ave, Popular Center, 19Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Angel Sosa-Baez

Attorney at Toro Colon & Mullet PSC

Po Box 195383

San Juan, PR 00919-5383

Laura Ganoza

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

One Biscayne Tower, 2 S Biscayne Blvd, Ste 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Briseida Y. Delgado-Miranda

Attorney at Delgado Miranda Law Offices LLC

Pmb 11, 130 Winston Churchill Ave, Ste 1

San Juan, PR 00926

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Noreen Wiscovitch Rentas

Pmb 136, 400 Kalaf Street

San Juan, PR 00918

Jason Mazer

Attorney at Cimo Mazer Mark PLLC

100 Se 2Nd St, Suite 3650

Miami, FL 33131

Gregory Grano

Attorney at Genovese Joblove & Battista PA

Bank Of America Tower, 44Th Flr, 100 Se 2Nd St

Miami, FL 33131-0000

Javier Franciso Vilarino Santiago

Attorney at Vilarino & Assoc LLC

Po Box 9022515

San Juan, PR 00902-2515

Jesus Suarez

Attorney at Genovese Joblove & Battista PA

Bank Of America Tower, 44Th Flr, 100 Se 2Nd St

Miami, FL 33131-0000

David C. Cimo

Attorney at Cimo Mazer Mark PLLC

100 Se 2Nd St, Suite 3650

Miami, FL 33131

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellants Jose Julian Alvarez, Charles Bimbela and Mary Deal in 19-2283 to response [ # 6335919-2 ], response [ # 6335909-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/08/2020. [19-2283, 20-1207] (AS) [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellant Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon in 20-1207 to response [ # 6335909-2 ], response [ # 6335919-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/08/2020. [20-1207, 19-2283] (BYD) [Entered: 05/08/2020 08:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 05/20/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: David C. Cimo for Noreen Wiscovitch Rentas, Gregory Grano for Noreen Wiscovitch Rentas, Jason Mazer for Noreen Wiscovitch Rentas, Joaquin Alemany for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Robert W. Davis, Jr. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Alfonso L Perez-Diaz for Juan C. Perez-Otero. [20-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 05/06/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellee Noreen Wiscovitch Rentas to motion to consolidate cases [ # 6333688-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2020. [20-1207] (JS) [Entered: 05/01/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon in 20-1207. Certificate of service dated 04/21/2020. [20-1207, 19-2283] (BYD) [Entered: 04/21/2020 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Supplement to Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon. Certificate of service dated 04/08/2020. [20-1207] (BYD) [Entered: 04/08/2020 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Noreen Wiscovitch Rentas filed by Attorney Jesus M. Suarez. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2020. [20-1207] (JS) [Entered: 04/03/2020 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2020. [20-1207] (BYD) [Entered: 04/02/2020 10:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2020. [20-1207] (BYD) [Entered: 04/02/2020 10:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon filed by Attorney Briseida Y. Delgado-Miranda. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2020. [20-1207] (BYD) [Entered: 04/02/2020 09:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #166) filed by Appellant Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon. Docketing Statement, Appearance Form, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/02/2020. [20-1207]. (RMK) [Entered: 03/19/2020 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AON RISK SOLUTIONS OF PUERTO RICO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant