This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/17/2022 at 06:09:52 (UTC).

Wineries of the Old Mission Pe, et al v. Township of Peninsula, MI

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Wineries of the Old Mission Pe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Township of Peninsula, MI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1744

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

TOWNSHIP OF PENINSULA, MI, a Michigan Municipal Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellees

WINERIES OF THE OLD MISSION PENINSULA ASSOCIATION, a Michigan Nonprofit Corporation (WOMP)

BOWERS HARBOR VINEYARD & WINERY, INC, a Michigan Corporation

BRYS WINERY, LC, a Michigan Corporation

CHATEAU GRAND TRAVERSE, LTD., a Michigan Corporation

GRAPE HARBOR INC., a Michigan Corporation

MONTAGUE DEVELOPMENT, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company

OV THE FARM LLC, a Michigan liability company

TABONE VINEYARDS, LLC, a Michigan liability company

TWO LADS, LLC, a Michigan liability company

VILLA MARI, LLC, a Michigan liability company

WINERY AT BLACK STAR FARMS LLC, a Michigan liability company

CHATEAU OPERATIONS, LTD, a Michigan Corporation

Petitioner / Appellant

PROTECT THE PENINSULA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory M. Meihn

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield

130 E. Nine Mile Road

Ferndale, MI 48220

Matthew T. Wise

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield

130 E. Nine Mile Road

Ferndale, MI 48220

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph M. Infante

Attorney at Miller Canfield

99 Monroe Avenue, N.W., Suite 1200

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Stephen M. Ragatzki

Attorney at Miller Canfield

99 Monroe Avenue, N.W., Suite 1200

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Tracy J. Andrews

Attorney at Law Office

619 Webster Street

Traverse City, MI 49686

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Protect the Peninsula, Inc... Certificate of Service: 01/11/2022. Argument Request: requested. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 01/11/2022 02:26 PM]

#19

(#19) BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Protect the Peninsula, Inc.: Use full, official caption on cover; every lower court document in addendum must include page ID ranges; unpublished cases listed in addendum that are not available electronically must be attached. Corrected brief due: 01/21/2022. (JAC) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:57 AM]

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

(#17) APPEARANCE filed for Township of Peninsula, MI by Matthew T. Wise. Certificate of Service: 12/08/2021. [21-1744] (MTW) [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:04 AM]

#16

(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Township of Peninsula, MI by Gregory M. Meihn. Certificate of Service: 12/08/2021. [21-1744] (MTW) [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:01 AM]

#15

(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/10/2022;. appellee brief due 02/09/2022; (MRL) [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:43 AM]

13 #5

corporate disclosure

13 #4

corporate disclosure

13 #3

corporate disclosure

#10

(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc... Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:54 AM]

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:53 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. by Tracy Jane Andrews. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:52 AM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 12/16/2021 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:57 PM]

#3

(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 2:00 pm EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/19/2021 01:52 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (MRL) [Entered: 11/18/2021 04:45 PM]

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#21) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 01/12/2022 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Protect the Peninsula, Inc... Certificate of Service: 01/11/2022. Argument Request: requested. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 01/11/2022 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Protect the Peninsula, Inc.: Use full, official caption on cover; every lower court document in addendum must include page ID ranges; unpublished cases listed in addendum that are not available electronically must be attached. Corrected brief due: 01/21/2022. (JAC) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - SEE BRIEFING CORRECTION LETTER SENT 1/11/2022 *** APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Protect the Peninsula, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2022. Argument Request: requested. [21-1744]--[Edited 01/11/2022 by JAC] (TJA) [Entered: 01/10/2022 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPEARANCE filed for Township of Peninsula, MI by Matthew T. Wise. Certificate of Service: 12/08/2021. [21-1744] (MTW) [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Township of Peninsula, MI by Gregory M. Meihn. Certificate of Service: 12/08/2021. [21-1744] (MTW) [Entered: 12/08/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/10/2022;. appellee brief due 02/09/2022; (MRL) [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Protect the Peninsula, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 12/01/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 12/01/2021 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph M. Infante for Appellees Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc, Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Association and Winery at Black Star Farms LLC Certificate of Service: 11/30/2021. [21-1744] (JMI) [Entered: 11/30/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc, Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Association and Winery at Black Star Farms LLC by Stephen M. Ragatzki. Certificate of Service: 11/29/2021. [21-1744] (SMR) [Entered: 11/29/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc... Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. by Tracy Jane Andrews. Certificate of Service: 11/24/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/24/2021 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NATIVE .PDF DOCUMENT SO FORM IS NOT MODIFIABLE***CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc... Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/23/2021 07:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NATIVE .PDF DOCUMENT SO FORM IS NOT MODIFIABLE***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Tracy J. Andrews for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/23/2021 07:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NATIVE .PDF DOCUMENT SO FORM IS NOT MODIFIABLE***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. by Tracy Jane Andrews. Certificate of Service: 11/23/2021. [21-1744] (TJA) [Entered: 11/23/2021 07:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 12/16/2021 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 2:00 pm EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/19/2021 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Michelle R. Lambert (MRL) [Entered: 11/18/2021 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Protect the Peninsula, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (MRL) [Entered: 11/18/2021 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chateau Operations, Inc. is a litigant