This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/08/2022 at 06:06:37 (UTC).

Windy City Limousine Company, v. Cincinnati Financial Corporati, et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Windy City Limousine Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Financial Corporati. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3296

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WINDY CITY LIMOUSINE COMPANY, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

CINCINNATI FINANCIAL CORPORATION

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY

CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY

VALLEY COMPANIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Kirschner

Attorney at CORBOY & DEMETRIO

33 N. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

Andrew Stevens

Attorney at CORBOY & DEMETRIO

33 N. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian M. Reid

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

303 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Katherine P. Decker

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

One N. Franklin Street

Chicago, IL 60606

James Hayes Ryan

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

One N. Franklin Street

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7205112] [2] [7205112] [21-3296] (AP) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:05 AM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7205167] [21-3296] (Kirschner, Daniel) [Entered: 12/14/2021 01:20 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [4] [7205325] [21-3296] (Kirschner, Daniel) [Entered: 12/15/2021 09:39 AM]

#5

(#5) ORDER: In the present case, defendants rely on diversity of citizenship for federal jurisdiction they removed the case from state court to federal court. However, appellants Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to identify the state of citizenship of all parties. Appellees must provide this information. Accordingly, appellees shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before December 23, 2021. (See order for further details). DW [5] [5] [7205659] [21-3296] (HTP) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:21 AM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Hayes Ryan for Appellee Valley Companies, Inc.. [6] [7206430] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3296]--[Edited 12/21/2021 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Ryan, James) [Entered: 12/21/2021 08:45 AM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian M. Reid for Appellees Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company and Cincinnati Indemnity Company. [7] [7206607] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3296] (Reid, Brian) [Entered: 12/21/2021 02:37 PM]

#8

(#8) Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellees Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Cincinnati Indemnity Company and Cincinnati Insurance Company. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7206860] [21-3296] (Reid, Brian) [Entered: 12/22/2021 12:45 PM]

#9

(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel S. Kirschner for Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [9] [7207531] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3296] (Kirschner, Daniel) [Entered: 12/27/2021 05:01 PM]

#10

(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew P. Stevens for Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [10] [7211570] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3296] --[Edited 01/18/2022 by ER - added Attorney Andrew P. Stevens] (Stevens, Andrew) [Entered: 01/18/2022 01:13 PM]

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/18/2022 for Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company and Valley Companies, Inc.. Paper copies due on 01/26/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [12] [7212047] [21-3296] (LJ) [Entered: 01/19/2022 02:56 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER: Appellant shall file a paper captioned Amended Jurisdictional Statement no later than 02/08/2022, that provide the omitted information noted above and otherwise complies with all the requirements of Circuit Rule 28(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Clerk DISTRIBUTE, along with the briefs in this appeal, copies of this order and appellants Amended Jurisdictional Statement to the assigned merits panel. (See order for further details). DW [13] [7214783] [21-3296] (MM) [Entered: 02/01/2022 04:19 PM]

#14

(#14) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [14] [7215624] [21-3296] (Kirschner, Daniel) [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:03 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [14] [7215624] [21-3296] (Kirschner, Daniel) [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Appellant shall file a paper captioned Amended Jurisdictional Statement no later than 02/08/2022, that provide the omitted information noted above and otherwise complies with all the requirements of Circuit Rule 28(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Clerk DISTRIBUTE, along with the briefs in this appeal, copies of this order and appellants Amended Jurisdictional Statement to the assigned merits panel. (See order for further details). DW [13] [7214783] [21-3296] (MM) [Entered: 02/01/2022 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/18/2022 for Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company and Valley Companies, Inc.. Paper copies due on 01/26/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [12] [7212047] [21-3296] (LJ) [Entered: 01/19/2022 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submitted appellant brief by Daniel S. Kirschner and Andrew P. Stevens for Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [11] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7212034] [21-3296] (Stevens, Andrew) [Entered: 01/19/2022 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew P. Stevens for Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [10] [7211570] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3296] --[Edited 01/18/2022 by ER - added Attorney Andrew P. Stevens] (Stevens, Andrew) [Entered: 01/18/2022 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel S. Kirschner for Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [9] [7207531] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3296] (Kirschner, Daniel) [Entered: 12/27/2021 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellees Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Cincinnati Indemnity Company and Cincinnati Insurance Company. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7206860] [21-3296] (Reid, Brian) [Entered: 12/22/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian M. Reid for Appellees Cincinnati Casualty Company, Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company and Cincinnati Indemnity Company. [7] [7206607] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3296] (Reid, Brian) [Entered: 12/21/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Hayes Ryan for Appellee Valley Companies, Inc.. [6] [7206430] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-3296]--[Edited 12/21/2021 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Ryan, James) [Entered: 12/21/2021 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: In the present case, defendants rely on diversity of citizenship for federal jurisdiction they removed the case from state court to federal court. However, appellants Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to identify the state of citizenship of all parties. Appellees must provide this information. Accordingly, appellees shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before December 23, 2021. (See order for further details). DW [5] [5] [7205659] [21-3296] (HTP) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [4] [7205325] [21-3296] (Kirschner, Daniel) [Entered: 12/15/2021 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7205167] [21-3296] (Kirschner, Daniel) [Entered: 12/14/2021 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7205112] [2] [7205112] [21-3296] (AP) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Windy City Limousine Company, LLC by 12/17/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 12/27/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 01/19/2022 for Windy City Limousine Company, LLC. [1] [7204770] [21-3296] (PS) [Entered: 12/13/2021 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Valley is a litigant

Latest cases where Cincinnati Financial Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cincinnati Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cincinnati Indemnity Company is a litigant