This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/09/2022 at 06:07:54 (UTC).

Wilson v. Marshall Shredding

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Wilson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Marshall Shredding. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-50709

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

William Wilson

Defendant / Appellees

Marshall Shredding, L.L.C.

Medsharps Treatment, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Vincent Galo Jr.

Attorney at Galo Law Firm, P.C.

4230 Gardendale Street

San Antonio, TX 78229-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christine Elaine Reinhard

Attorney at Schmoyer Reinhard, L.L.P.

8000 Ih 10, W.

San Antonio, TX 78230

Michael James Ritter

Attorney at Schmoyer Reinhard, L.L.P.

8000 Ih 10, W.

San Antonio, TX 78230

Thomas Newton Cammack III

Attorney at Schmoyer Reinhard, L.L.P.

8000 Ih 10, W.

San Antonio, TX 78230

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Wilson [22-50709] (MVM) [Entered: 08/10/2022 12:30 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9914569-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/29/2022 for Appellant William Wilson. Transcript order due on 08/29/2022 for Appellant William Wilson [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 08/12/2022 09:50 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50709] (Michael Vincent Galo Jr.) [Entered: 08/25/2022 03:25 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50709] (Michael James Ritter ) [Entered: 08/26/2022 08:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Christine Elaine Reinhard for Marshall Shredding, L.L.C. and Medsharps Treatment, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50709] (Christine Elaine Reinhard ) [Entered: 08/26/2022 08:44 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-50709] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. William Wilson advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 08/29/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Galo; Attorney for Appellees: Reinhard, Ritter [22-50709] (Michael Vincent Galo Jr.) [Entered: 08/29/2022 09:27 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50709] (Thomas Newton Cammack III) [Entered: 08/30/2022 10:00 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/31/2022 for Appellant William Wilson. [22-50709] (DDL) [Entered: 09/19/2022 01:15 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. William Wilson for filing Filing of Appellant's Brief until 11/14/2022 [22-50709] (Michael Vincent Galo Jr.) [Entered: 10/05/2022 02:46 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. William Wilson. Extension Granted to and including 11/14/2022. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/14/2022 for Appellant William Wilson [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 10/05/2022 03:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. William Wilson for filing Filing of Appellant's Brief until 11/14/2022 [22-50709] (Michael Vincent Galo Jr.) [Entered: 10/05/2022 02:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/31/2022 for Appellant William Wilson. [22-50709] (DDL) [Entered: 09/19/2022 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-50709] (DDL) [Entered: 09/16/2022 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Thomas Newton Cammack III for party(s) Appellee Medsharps Treatment, L.L.C. Appellee Marshall Shredding, L.L.C., in case 22-50709 [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 08/30/2022 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:20-CV-1470. Electronic ROA due on 09/14/2022. [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 08/30/2022 11:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketFEE PAID by Appellant Mr. William Wilson. Fee deadline satisfied [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 08/30/2022 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50709] (Thomas Newton Cammack III) [Entered: 08/30/2022 10:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-50709] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. William Wilson advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 08/29/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Galo; Attorney for Appellees: Reinhard, Ritter [22-50709] (Michael Vincent Galo Jr.) [Entered: 08/29/2022 09:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael James Ritter for party(s) Appellee Medsharps Treatment, L.L.C. Appellee Marshall Shredding, L.L.C., in case 22-50709 [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 08/26/2022 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Christine Elaine Reinhard for Appellee Medsharps Treatment, L.L.C. in 22-50709, Attorney Christine Elaine Reinhard for Appellee Marshall Shredding, L.L.C. in 22-50709 [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 08/26/2022 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael Vincent Galo Jr. for Appellant William Wilson in 22-50709 [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 08/26/2022 11:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Christine Elaine Reinhard for Marshall Shredding, L.L.C. and Medsharps Treatment, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50709] (Christine Elaine Reinhard ) [Entered: 08/26/2022 08:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50709] (Michael James Ritter ) [Entered: 08/26/2022 08:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50709] (Michael Vincent Galo Jr.) [Entered: 08/25/2022 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9914569-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/29/2022 for Appellant William Wilson. Transcript order due on 08/29/2022 for Appellant William Wilson [22-50709] (LEF) [Entered: 08/12/2022 09:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Wilson [22-50709] (MVM) [Entered: 08/10/2022 12:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Newton Cammack, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Elaine Reinhard