Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2019 at 06:05:57 (UTC).

Wilson v. HSBC Bank, USA

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Wilson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HSBC Bank, USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-920

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Prudential Rand Realty, Inc., a business

Mortgageit, Inc., a corporation

All persons and entities with interest in real property located at 4 William Street, Ossining, New York

Does 1-100

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as a nominee of Mortgageit, Inc.

Defendant / Appellee

HSBC Bank, USA

Plaintiff / Appellant

Sherwin A. Wilson

Ossining, NY 10562

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Shane Biffar Esq.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Metlife Building, 200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Patrick G. Broderick Esq.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

777 South Flagler Drive

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sherwin A. Wilson

4 William Street

Ossining, NY 10562

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson Brief due date as 07/29/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 07/29/2019, copy to pro se, FILED.[2570160] [19-920] [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:40 AM]

#23

(#23) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, informing Court of proposed due date 07/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/17/2019 by US mail.[2567491] [19-920] [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:37 PM]

#21

(#21) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED. Service date 05/09/2019 by US mail.[2563616] [19-920] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:13 PM]

#20

(#20) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2552675] [19-920] [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:31 AM]

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank, USA, FILED. Service date 04/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2549414] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 01:32 PM]

#13

(#13) NOTICE, to Appellee HSBC Bank, USA, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2549011] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:31 AM]

#11

(#11) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED. Service date 04/25/2019 by hand delivery.[2549005] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:28 AM]

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED. Service date 04/25/2019 by US mail, hand delivery.[2549002] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:28 AM]

#8

(#8) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [7], on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2547711] [19-920] [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:42 PM]

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2537323] [19-920] [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:03 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2537318] [19-920] [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:01 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/01/2019, RECEIVED.[2537317] [19-920] [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:01 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson Brief due date as 07/29/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 07/29/2019, copy to pro se, FILED.[2570160] [19-920] [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, informing Court of proposed due date 07/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/17/2019 by US mail.[2567491] [19-920] [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED. Service date 05/09/2019 by US mail.[2563616] [19-920] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2552675] [19-920] [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ATTORNEY, Patrick G. Broderick, [ # 15 ], in place of attorney Shane Biffar, SUBSTITUTED.[2549829] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank, USA, FILED. Service date 04/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2549414] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE, to Appellee HSBC Bank, USA, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2549011] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CURED DEFECTIVE Form D-P [ # 11 ], [7], on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED.[2549006] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED. Service date 04/25/2019 by hand delivery.[2549005] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED. Service date 04/25/2019 by US mail, hand delivery.[2549002] [19-920] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [7], on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2547711] [19-920] [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • (#7) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED. Service date 04/24/2019 by hand delivery.[2547707] [19-920] [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • (#6) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, district court receipt # 465407016939, FILED.[2537645] [19-920] [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2537323] [19-920] [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2537320] [19-920] [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2537318] [19-920] [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/01/2019, RECEIVED.[2537317] [19-920] [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sherwin A. Wilson, FILED. [2537315] [19-920] [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGEIT INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant