This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/03/2021 at 06:07:59 (UTC).

Wilson v. City of Southlake

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Wilson filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against City of Southlake. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10771

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Chad Wilson, Individually and as next friend of S.W.

Martha Wilson, Individually and as next friend of S.W.

Defendant / Appellee

City of Southlake

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Martin J. Cirkiel

Attorney at Cirkiel & Associates, P.C.

1901 E. Palm Valley Boulevard

Round Rock, TX 78664-0000

Jaime Santos

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, L.L.P.

1900 N Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-1612

Jordan Bock

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, L.L.P.

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William Wayne Krueger Esq. III

Attorney at Law Office Of William W. Krueger, III, P.C.

501 W. Lookout Drive

Richardson, TX 75080

Daniel Basham

501 W. Lookout Drive

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellee City of Southlake [ # 9662840-2 ] [21-10771] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/20/2021 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9667988-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10771] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/20/2021 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9665352-2] NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Chad Wilson and Ms. Martha Wilson. [9665352-1] [21-10771] (LEF) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCOURT ACTION withdrawing Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellee City of Southlake [ # 9656626-2 ] [21-10771] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to withdraw document filed by Appellee City of Southlake [ # 9663037-2 ]; to withdraw the Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [ # 9656626-2 ] [9663861-2] [21-10771] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee City of Southlake to withdraw the Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [ # 9656626-2 ] [9663037-2]. Date of service: 09/13/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Basham, Krueger; Attorney for Appellants: Bock, Cirkiel, Santos [21-10771] (William Wayne Krueger III) [Entered: 09/13/2021 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee City of Southlake to view sealed documents. Date of service: 09/13/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Basham, Krueger; Attorney for Appellants: Bock, Cirkiel, Santos [21-10771] (William Wayne Krueger III) [Entered: 09/13/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting in part Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Mr. Chad Wilson and Ms. Martha Wilson [ # 9656459-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/27/2021 for Appellants Chad Wilson and Martha Wilson [21-10771] (LEF) [Entered: 09/02/2021 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE DUE to Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellee City of Southlake in 21-10771 [ # 9656626-2 ]Response/Opposition due on 09/13/2021 [21-10771] (PAC) [Entered: 09/02/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWN OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee City of Southlake to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9656626-2]. Date of service: 09/02/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Basham, Krueger; Attorney for Appellants: Bock, Cirkiel, Santos [21-10771] (William Wayne Krueger III) [Entered: 09/02/2021 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jaime Santos for party(s) Appellant Martha Wilson Appellant Chad Wilson, in case 21-10771 [21-10771] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/17/2021 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-10771] (Jordan Bock ) [Entered: 08/16/2021 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10771] (Jaime Santos ) [Entered: 08/16/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/27/2021 for Appellants Chad Wilson and Martha Wilson. [21-10771] (CMB) [Entered: 08/16/2021 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-10771] (CMB) [Entered: 08/16/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9642601-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10771] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/13/2021 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9636954-2] NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Chad Wilson and Ms. Martha Wilson. [9636954-1] [21-10771] (LEF) [Entered: 08/06/2021 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:16-CV-57. Electronic ROA due on 08/20/2021. [21-10771] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/05/2021 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9636031-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10771] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/05/2021 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Chad Wilson and Ms. Martha Wilson [21-10771] (LEF) [Entered: 08/04/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William W Krueger, III