This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/14/2022 at 06:20:29 (UTC).

Willie Lewis v. BP Exploration & Production Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Willie Lewis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10101

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIE LEWIS

Defendant / Appellees

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Timothy John Falcon

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Blvd

Marrero, LA 70072

Jeremiah A. Sprague

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Blvd

Marrero, LA 70072

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ericson W. Enger

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jessica Marie Kennedy

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1200, Po Box 4924

Orlando, FL 32802-4924

Sarah A. Long

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1200, Po Box 4924

Orlando, FL 32802-4924

Francis M. McDonald Jr.

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1200, Po Box 4924

Orlando, FL 32802-4924

Thomas W. Tardy III

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Stefan G. Bourn

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Richard M. Crump

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Kalleigh Amber McCoy

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Youlin Yuan

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE to Parties [22-10116, 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:34 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DC Order doc 64

Open Document #4

DC R&R doc 63

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin Michael Hodges for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10101] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:25 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Youlin Yuan for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10101] (ECF: Youlin Yuan) [Entered: 01/27/2022 06:04 PM]

Open Document

Letter regarding consolidation of appeals filed by Attorney Kevin Michael Hodges for Appellees BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10101] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:46 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to the Court's February 8, 2022 order, the parties are directed to docket all filings related to this appeal only in no. 22-10099. See no. 22-10099 for all further filings related to this appeal. [22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 02/09/2022 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The parties did not object to the consolidation of these appeals, the following appeals are CONSOLIDATED: appeal nos. 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10 (the "Consolidated Appeals"). AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 02/08/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter regarding consolidation of appeals filed by Attorney Kevin Michael Hodges for Appellees BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10101] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Youlin Yuan for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10101] (ECF: Youlin Yuan) [Entered: 01/27/2022 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin Michael Hodges for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10101] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE to Parties [22-10116, 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Willie Lewis on 01/12/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/27/2022 as to Appellant Willie Lewis. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/10/2022 as to Appellees [Entered: 01/14/2022 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kalleigh Amber McCoy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ericson W. Enger