This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/24/2021 at 06:13:54 (UTC).

Williams v. TH Healthcare

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Williams filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against TH Healthcare. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-20161

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

TH Healthcare Limited, Park Plaza Hospital (Parent Organization: Amisub of Texas, Incorporated)

Plaintiff / Appellant

Dovie Lavette Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Angeles Garcia Cassin

Shira R. Yoshor

James Norman Boudreau

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dovie Lavette Williams

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document #2

Unfiled Document

Open Document #3

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #2

DIS-2 Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9578751-2] [21-20161] (CCR) [Entered: 05/20/2021 10:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the docketing statement and entry of appearance received from Appellant Ms. Dovie Lavette Williams because the documents are not forms from our court, nor are they required [21-20161] (CCR) [Entered: 04/28/2021 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Dovie Lavette Williams. [21-20161] (CCR) [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9561597-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/13/2021 for Appellant Dovie Lavette Williams [21-20161] (CCR) [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Dovie Lavette Williams [21-20161] (CAG) [Entered: 03/25/2021 02:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less