This case was last updated from PACER on 03/25/2019 at 06:05:48 (UTC).

Williams v. Bharara

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Williams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bharara. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-248

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Michael Fuqua, Receiver

James N. Hatten, Clerk of Court, GA

Marcela C. Mateo

Ruby J. Krajick, Clerk of Court NY

Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk of Court

Mark S. DeMarco, CJA

Bronx, NY 10461

Preet Bharara, USAO

Plaintiff / Appellant

John T. Williams

Jonesboro, GA 30238

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin H. Torrance

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Mark S. DeMarco

Attorney at Law Office of Mark DeMarco

2027 Williamsbridge Road

Bronx, NY 10461

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John T. Williams

437 Kendrick East Drive

Jonesboro, GA 30238

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/21/2018, RECEIVED.[2482851] [19-248] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:57 PM]

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/21/2018, RECEIVED.[2482857] [19-248] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:59 PM]

#7

(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2482864] [19-248] [Entered: 01/25/2019 05:04 PM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DUPLICATE APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED. [2485145] [19-248] [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:54 AM]

9 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#27

(#27) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant John T. Williams' motion to consolidate appeals [14] from the docket, FILED.[2516484] [19-248] [Entered: 03/12/2019 05:33 PM]

#24

(#24) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P, [22], [23], on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED.[2514234] [19-248] [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:55 PM]

#21

(#21) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED. Service date 02/28/2019 by US mail.[2514196] [19-248] [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:38 PM]

#20

(#20) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Mark S. DeMarco, informing the Court that he does not intend to participate in the appeal unless requested to do so by the Court, RECEIVED. Service date 03/02/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2509289] [19-248] [Entered: 03/02/2019 06:55 PM]

19 #2

Supporting Document

19 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

18 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

18 #2

Certificate of Service

#17

(#17) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Preet Bharara, Ruby J. Krajick, Marcela C. Mateo and Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, informing the Court that the appellees do not intend to participate in the appeal unless requested to do so by the Court, RECEIVED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2507065] [19-248] [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:56 PM]

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant John T. Williams' motion to consolidate appeals [14] from the docket, FILED.[2516484] [19-248] [Entered: 03/12/2019 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P, [22], [23], on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED.[2514234] [19-248] [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • (#23) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED. Service date 02/28/2019 by US mail.[2514200] [19-248] [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • (#22) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party John T. Williams, FILED. Service date 02/28/2018 by US mail.[2514198] [19-248] [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED. Service date 02/28/2019 by US mail.[2514196] [19-248] [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Mark S. DeMarco, informing the Court that he does not intend to participate in the appeal unless requested to do so by the Court, RECEIVED. Service date 03/02/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2509289] [19-248] [Entered: 03/02/2019 06:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mark S. DeMarco, FILED. Service date 03/02/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2509288] [19-248] [Entered: 03/02/2019 06:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Preet Bharara, Ruby J. Krajick, Marcela C. Mateo and Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2507071] [19-248] [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Preet Bharara, Ruby J. Krajick, Marcela C. Mateo and Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, informing the Court that the appellees do not intend to participate in the appeal unless requested to do so by the Court, RECEIVED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2507065] [19-248] [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE, to Appellee Preet Bharara, Mark S. DeMarco, Ruby J. Krajick, Marcela C. Mateo and Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2505230] [19-248] [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#12) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED. Service date 02/06/2019 by US mail.[2495784] [19-248] [Entered: 02/13/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#11) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED. Service date 02/06/2019 by US mail.[2495780] [19-248] [Entered: 02/13/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party John T. Williams, FILED. Service date 02/06/2019 by US mail.[2495777] [19-248] [Entered: 02/13/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2485147] [19-248] [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DUPLICATE APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED. [2485145] [19-248] [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2482864] [19-248] [Entered: 01/25/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/21/2018, RECEIVED.[2482857] [19-248] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2482862] [19-248] [Entered: 01/25/2019 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/21/2018, RECEIVED.[2482851] [19-248] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John T. Williams, FILED. [2482845] [19-248] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.