This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/06/2021 at 06:26:20 (UTC).

William White v. USA

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 William White filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2835

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM A. WHITE

Marion, IL 62959-0000

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William A. White

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY

P.O. Box 1000

Marion, IL 62959-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Suzanne M. Garrison

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Nine Executive Drive

Fairview Heights, IL 62208-0000

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2835, 21-2881 to present supplemental facts in support of appellant's opening brief and pending motions to stay. [21] [7203219] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MAN) [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:59 PM]

#20

(#20) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881 for extension of time to pay filing fee. [20] [7203218] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MAN) [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:58 PM]

#19

(#19) 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881, 21-2835. Disk not required. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [19] [7202475] [21-2881, 21-2835] (CM) [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:36 AM]

#18

(#18) ORDER re: Motion for leave to file instanter, filed on 11/29/2021. In light of the courts briefing order dated November 16, 2021, the motion is unnecessary and will be filed without further court action. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the tendered brief of the appellant. CMD [18] [7202452] [21-2881, 21-2835] (FP) [Entered: 12/01/2021 09:56 AM]

17 #2

Brief

17 #1

Motion for leave to file tendered materials

#16

(#16) Filed Response in Opposition by Appellee BOP in 21-2881 Attorney Suzanne M. Garrison to MOTION TO STAY THE DISTRICT COURTS FILING RESTRICTION PENDING APPEAL. [16][7200552] [21-2881, 21-2835] (Garrison, Suzanne) [Entered: 11/22/2021 09:18 AM]

#15

(#15) ORDER re: 1) Motion for Joinder of Appeals from White v United States SD IL Case No: 17-cv-683 and White v Collis SD IL Case No: 17-cv-1117. 2) United States of Americas Response to Motion for Joinder of Appeals. 3) Motion for Stay Pending Appeal of the District Courts Order of September 27, 2021, Absolutely Barring Me from Filing Any Document in Any Matter New or Pending in the Southern District of Illinois for Two Years (Doc 24). The motion to consolidate is GRANTED. These appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. Briefing in the consolidated appeal is reset as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2021 for William A. White. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/18/2022 for United States of America and Federal Bureau of Prisons. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/08/2022 for Appellant William A. White. Further, the request to seal documents included in the motion to stay, filed as Doc. 7 in No. 21-2881, is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall separate the motion and appellants exhibits and file the exhibits under seal. The motion shall be filed in the public record. Finally, appellee may respond, on or before November 30, 2021, to appellants motion to stay, filed as Doc. 7 in No. 21-2881. Appellee may include arguments relating to either appeal or any of appellants motions to stay in that response. [ # 5 ] [ # 7199238-2 ] JPK [15] [7199518] [21-2835, 21-2881] (AD) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:01 PM]

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

#2

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2835, 21-2881 to present supplemental facts in support of appellant's opening brief and pending motions to stay. [21] [7203219] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MAN) [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881 for extension of time to pay filing fee. [20] [7203218] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MAN) [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881, 21-2835. Disk not required. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [19] [7202475] [21-2881, 21-2835] (CM) [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER re: Motion for leave to file instanter, filed on 11/29/2021. In light of the courts briefing order dated November 16, 2021, the motion is unnecessary and will be filed without further court action. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the tendered brief of the appellant. CMD [18] [7202452] [21-2881, 21-2835] (FP) [Entered: 12/01/2021 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Prose motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881, 21-2835 to file appellant's brief. 1 copy of brief tendered. [17] [7201954] [21-2881, 21-2835] (CM) [Entered: 11/29/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed Response in Opposition by Appellee BOP in 21-2881 Attorney Suzanne M. Garrison to MOTION TO STAY THE DISTRICT COURTS FILING RESTRICTION PENDING APPEAL. [16][7200552] [21-2881, 21-2835] (Garrison, Suzanne) [Entered: 11/22/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re: 1) Motion for Joinder of Appeals from White v United States SD IL Case No: 17-cv-683 and White v Collis SD IL Case No: 17-cv-1117. 2) United States of Americas Response to Motion for Joinder of Appeals. 3) Motion for Stay Pending Appeal of the District Courts Order of September 27, 2021, Absolutely Barring Me from Filing Any Document in Any Matter New or Pending in the Southern District of Illinois for Two Years (Doc 24). The motion to consolidate is GRANTED. These appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. Briefing in the consolidated appeal is reset as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2021 for William A. White. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/18/2022 for United States of America and Federal Bureau of Prisons. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/08/2022 for Appellant William A. White. Further, the request to seal documents included in the motion to stay, filed as Doc. 7 in No. 21-2881, is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall separate the motion and appellants exhibits and file the exhibits under seal. The motion shall be filed in the public record. Finally, appellee may respond, on or before November 30, 2021, to appellants motion to stay, filed as Doc. 7 in No. 21-2881. Appellee may include arguments relating to either appeal or any of appellants motions to stay in that response. [ # 5 ] [ # 7199238-2 ] JPK [15] [7199518] [21-2835, 21-2881] (AD) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed Response by Appellant William A. White to to the USA's response to the motion to stay. [14][7199237] [21-2835] (CAH) [Entered: 11/15/2021 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant William A. White. [13] [7196334] [21-2835] (CAH) [Entered: 11/02/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White for stay pending appeal of the District Court's order of September 27, 2021, absolutely barring appellant from filing any document in any matter new or pending in the Southern District of Illinois for Two Years (Doc 116). [12] [7195817] [21-2835] (CMD) [Entered: 10/29/2021 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed Response by Appellee USA Attorney Suzanne M. Garrison to Appellants Motion for Joinder of Appeals (Doc. 5). [10][7193091] [21-2835] (Garrison, Suzanne) [Entered: 10/20/2021 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Response by Appellee USA Attorney Suzanne M. Garrison to Appellant's Motion to Stay the District Court Order Imposing a Filing Restriction (Doc. 4). [9][7193087] [21-2835] (Garrison, Suzanne) [Entered: 10/20/2021 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Filed clerk's notice to Appellee USA to file a response to MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL and MOTION FOR JOINDER OF APPEALS. Response due for Appellee United States of America by 10/28/2021. JPK [8] [7192077] [21-2835] (ER) [Entered: 10/15/2021 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/15/2021 for William A. White. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/13/2021 for United States of America. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/03/2022 for Appellant William A. White [7] [7192023] [21-2835] (CM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: On October 7, 2021, the appellant filed a notice of appeal from the district court's judgment, and appeal no. 21-2835 was opened. On October 12, 2021, the court received another copy of appellants notice of appeal and a second appeal, 21-2854, was opened. Both filings seek to challenge the same district court judgment, and two separate appeals are not necessary. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that appeal no. 21-2854 is administratively CLOSED. No appellate filing fees for appeal no. 21-2854 shall be imposed. [6] [7191778] [21-2835, 21-2854] (ER) [Entered: 10/14/2021 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White for joinder of appeals from White v. United States and White v. Collis. [5] [7191319] [21-2835] (MAN) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White for stay pending appeal. [4] [7191318] [21-2835] (MAN) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William A. White. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7191317] [21-2835] (MAN) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [2][7190877] [21-2835] (CM) [Entered: 10/08/2021 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Federal prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant William A. White by 10/14/2021. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 11/08/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 10/21/2021. [1] [7190836] [21-2835] (AG) [Entered: 10/08/2021 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Suzanne M. Garrison