Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/24/2019 at 06:08:46 (UTC).

William Rogers v. Tony Mays

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 William Rogers filed a Prisoner - Death Penalty lawsuit against Tony Mays. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5427

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Death Penalty

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

WILLIAM GLENN ROGERS

Respondent / Appellee

TONY MAYS, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Kimberly S. Hodde

Attorney at Law Office

40 Music Square, E.

Nashville, TN 37203

Kelley J. Henry

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

810 Broadway, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37203

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Richard Davison Douglas

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING Appellant's motion extend time (120 days) [ # 8 ] filed by Ms. Kelley J. Henry. (PJE) [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:02 PM]

9 #4

R.163 order

9 #3

R. 162 judgment

9 #2

R. 161 memorandum opinion

9 #1

Case Opening Letter

#8

(#8) MOTION filed by Ms. Kelley J. Henry for William Glenn Rogers to extend time Petitioner's Motion To Extend Time To File A Motion To Expand Certificate Of Appealability Certificate of Service: 06/12/2019. [19-5427] (KJH) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:21 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Tony Mays by Richard D. Douglas. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (RDD) [Entered: 06/04/2019 01:11 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant William Glenn Rogers by Kimberly S. Hodde. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (KSH) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:49 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant William Glenn Rogers by Kelley J. Henry. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (KJH) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:35 PM]

4 #2

4a4 order filed

4 #1

Case Opening Letter

#2

(#2) 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance pending rulig on R. 155 MOTION to Alter Judgment Petitioner's Motion To Alter Or Amend A Judgment by William Glenn Rogers (PJE) [Entered: 04/25/2019 07:27 AM]

#1

(#1) Death Penalty Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant William Glenn Rogers. Transcript needed: y. (PJE) [Entered: 04/25/2019 07:24 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • (#11) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Ms. Kelley J. Henry for William Glenn Rogers. Certificate of Service: 06/21/2019. [19-5427] (KJH) [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING Appellant's motion extend time (120 days) [ # 8 ] filed by Ms. Kelley J. Henry. (PJE) [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 4A4 ORDER from district court filed. Order Filed:05/31/2019 R. 161 R. 162 and R.163 (PJE) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION filed by Ms. Kelley J. Henry for William Glenn Rogers to extend time Petitioner's Motion To Extend Time To File A Motion To Expand Certificate Of Appealability Certificate of Service: 06/12/2019. [19-5427] (KJH) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Tony Mays by Richard D. Douglas. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (RDD) [Entered: 06/04/2019 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant William Glenn Rogers by Kimberly S. Hodde. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (KSH) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant William Glenn Rogers by Kelley J. Henry. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (KJH) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) 4A4 ORDER from district court filed. Order Filed:05/31/2019. R.163 (PJE) [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • (#3) The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 04/25/2019 07:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance pending rulig on R. 155 MOTION to Alter Judgment Petitioner's Motion To Alter Or Amend A Judgment by William Glenn Rogers (PJE) [Entered: 04/25/2019 07:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Death Penalty Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant William Glenn Rogers. Transcript needed: y. (PJE) [Entered: 04/25/2019 07:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Davison Douglas