This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2019 at 06:04:44 (UTC).

William Rogers, Jr. v. Brian Foster

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 William Rogers, Jr filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Brian Foster. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2803

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

WILLIAM D. ROGERS, JR.

Winnebago, WI 54985-0000

Respondent / Appellee

BRIAN FOSTER, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

William D. Rogers Jr.

Attorney at WISCONSIN RESOURCE CENTER

1505 North Drive, P.O. Box 220

Winnebago, WI 54985-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Aaron R. O'Neil

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [10] [7043249] [19-2803] (DRS) [Entered: 11/13/2019 08:46 AM]

9 #2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

9 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7039382] [19-2803] (AP) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:30 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER re: Letter, filed on 10/24/19. The appellant shall file the overdue Circuit Rule3(c) docketing statement by November 8, 2019. [ # 6 ] CMD [7] [7039182] [19-2803] (FP) [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:29 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed letter from Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr. regarding docketing statement. [6] [7039092] [19-2803] (PS) [Entered: 10/24/2019 02:26 PM]

5 #2

Motion for IFP to Transfer to DC

5 #1

Order to Transfer IFP Motion

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr. for discretionary appointment of counsel. [3] [7036973] [19-2803] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 12:59 PM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr. is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant William D. Rogers Jr. by 10/25/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7017 2680 0001 1549 6098. [2] [7036268] [19-2803] (AD) [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:11 AM]

1 #4

Fee Notice

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

State Habeas/Appealability Denied Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [10] [7043249] [19-2803] (DRS) [Entered: 11/13/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 10/25/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 11/27/2019 for Appellant William D. Rogers Jr. [7039772] [9] [7039772] [19-2803] (AP) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7039382] [19-2803] (AP) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER re: Letter, filed on 10/24/19. The appellant shall file the overdue Circuit Rule3(c) docketing statement by November 8, 2019. [ # 6 ] CMD [7] [7039182] [19-2803] (FP) [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed letter from Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr. regarding docketing statement. [6] [7039092] [19-2803] (PS) [Entered: 10/24/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [5] [7036976] [19-2803] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prose motion filed by Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [4] [7036974] [19-2803] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr. for discretionary appointment of counsel. [3] [7036973] [19-2803] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Appellant William D. Rogers, Jr. is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant William D. Rogers Jr. by 10/25/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7017 2680 0001 1549 6098. [2] [7036268] [19-2803] (AD) [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 08/22/2019. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant William D. Rogers Jr. by 09/25/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 10/02/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 10/02/2019 for Appellant William D. Rogers Jr.. [1] [7031351] [19-2803] (PS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less