This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/20/2022 at 06:10:12 (UTC).

William Lemons, Jr. v. Principal Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 William Lemons, Jr filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Principal Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-12064

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM A. LEMONS, JR.

Defendant / Appellee

PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lee P. Fernon Jr.

Thomas O. Sinclair

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John C. Neiman Jr.

Craig William Courtney

Edward Morris Holt

Michael D. Mulvaney

Grace Robinson Murphy

Ashlee Dee Riopka

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Barry Alan Ragsdale

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/13/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/08/2022 10:50 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John C. Neiman, Jr. for Appellee Principal Life Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12064] (ECF: John Neiman) [Entered: 07/22/2022 03:33 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Carrie Robinson, 07/07/2022, William A. Lemons, Jr., Trial 08/16/2021 - 08/20/2021. [Entered: 07/13/2022 02:27 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Neiman Jr for Principal Life Insurance Company [22-12064] (ECF: John Neiman) [Entered: 07/11/2022 05:15 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig William Courtney for Principal Life Insurance Company [22-12064] (ECF: Craig Courtney) [Entered: 07/11/2022 04:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Grace Robinson Murphy for Principal Life Insurance Company. [22-12064] (ECF: Grace Murphy) [Entered: 07/11/2022 03:55 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lee P. Fernon, Jr. for Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12064] (ECF: Lee Fernon) [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:42 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Lee P. Fernon, Jr. for Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr.. [22-12064] (ECF: Lee Fernon) [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:39 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 04/29/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/07/2019. [Entered: 07/08/2022 03:44 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Margaret Wasmund, Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 07/06/2022, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 06/29/2021. [Entered: 07/07/2022 04:16 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas O. Sinclair for William A. Lemons, Jr.. [22-12064] (ECF: Thomas Sinclair) [Entered: 07/05/2022 01:02 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Lee P. Fernon, Jr. for Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr.. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-12064] (ECF: Lee Fernon) [Entered: 07/05/2022 12:46 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lee P. Fernon, Jr. for William A. Lemons, Jr.. [22-12064] (ECF: Lee Fernon) [Entered: 07/05/2022 12:30 PM]

Open Document #7

Order DE #199

Open Document #6

Order DE #122

Open Document #5

Order DE #55

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/13/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/08/2022 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Carrie Robinson, Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 08/04/2022, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 08/16/2021 - 08/20/2021. [Entered: 08/08/2022 10:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John C. Neiman, Jr. for Appellee Principal Life Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12064] (ECF: John Neiman) [Entered: 07/22/2022 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 07/20/2022 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 04/29/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/07/2019. [Entered: 07/19/2022 09:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Carrie Robinson, 07/07/2022, William A. Lemons, Jr., Trial 08/16/2021 - 08/20/2021. [Entered: 07/13/2022 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Neiman Jr for Principal Life Insurance Company [22-12064] (ECF: John Neiman) [Entered: 07/11/2022 05:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig William Courtney for Principal Life Insurance Company [22-12064] (ECF: Craig Courtney) [Entered: 07/11/2022 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Grace Robinson Murphy for Principal Life Insurance Company. [22-12064] (ECF: Grace Murphy) [Entered: 07/11/2022 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lee P. Fernon, Jr. for Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12064] (ECF: Lee Fernon) [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Lee P. Fernon, Jr. for Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr.. [22-12064] (ECF: Lee Fernon) [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 04/29/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/07/2019. [Entered: 07/08/2022 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Margaret Wasmund, Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 07/06/2022, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 06/29/2021. [Entered: 07/07/2022 04:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 03/07/2019 ; Transcript Order: Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Court Reporter: Margaret Wasmund, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 06/29/2021 ; Transcript Order: Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Court Reporter: Carrie Robinson, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 08/16/2021 - 08/20/2021 ; Transcript Order: Filer: William A. Lemons, Jr., Court Reporter: Lindy Fuller, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 05/15/2019. [Entered: 07/07/2022 04:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas O. Sinclair for William A. Lemons, Jr.. [22-12064] (ECF: Thomas Sinclair) [Entered: 07/05/2022 01:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Lee P. Fernon, Jr. for Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr.. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-12064] (ECF: Lee Fernon) [Entered: 07/05/2022 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lee P. Fernon, Jr. for William A. Lemons, Jr.. [22-12064] (ECF: Lee Fernon) [Entered: 07/05/2022 12:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant William A. Lemons, Jr. on 06/21/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/11/2022 as to Appellant William A. Lemons Jr.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/25/2022 as to Appellee Principal Life Insurance Company [Entered: 06/27/2022 03:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less