This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2020 at 06:12:21 (UTC).

William Irving v. Carmen Ventura, et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 William Irving filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Carmen Ventura. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2888

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Isaac Sonny Collins, Assistant Warden

Carmen Ventura, Counselor

Michael Kimbrough, Functional Unit Manager

Jennifer Caldwell, Captain

Anne L. Precythe, MO DOC Director

Whitney Edwards, Functional Unit Manager

Marijoe Thumbel, Mental Health Counselor

Plaintiff / Appellant

William E. Irving

Cameron, MO 64429-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William E. Irving

Attorney at WESTERN MISSOURI CORRECTIONAL CENTER

609 E. Pence Road

Cameron, MO 64429-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #2

Envelope

Open Restricted Document #1

Inmate Account Statement

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Denying as Moot [ # 4961945-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. William E. Irving. [4961948] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:32 PM]

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Motion

Open Restricted Document #4

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #3

Envelope

Open Restricted Document #2

Cover Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4954555] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 09/10/2020 04:20 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 10/08/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4954550] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 09/10/2020 04:16 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 09/02/2020, Judgment 09/02/2020, and Order 09/09/2020. [4954534] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 09/10/2020 04:08 PM]

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [4954481] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 09/10/2020 03:22 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Mr. William E. Irving on 11/04/2020.[4973024] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: Denying as Moot [ # 4961945-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. William E. Irving. [4961948] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. William E. Irving w/service 10/02/2020. [4961945] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. William E. Irving w/service 10/02/2020. [4961939] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4954555] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 09/10/2020 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 10/08/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4954550] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 09/10/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 09/02/2020, Judgment 09/02/2020, and Order 09/09/2020. [4954534] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 09/10/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [4954481] [20-2888] (CJO) [Entered: 09/10/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less