This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 06:04:54 (UTC).

William Grant, II v. Gregory Harris, et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 William Grant, II filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gregory Harris. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5136

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Gregory K. Harris, AUSA

Joint Chiefs of Staff

Plaintiff / Appellant

William Lee Grant, II

Springfield, IL 62702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Lee Grant II

901 Wythe Road

Springfield, IL 62702

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1789243] received from Will Grant [signed for on 05/14/2019] for order [1787299-2] sent to Appellant William Lee Grant, II [19-5136] [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:40 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1787297] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/01/2019. APPENDIX due 07/01/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5136] [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:00 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787287] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00641-UNA filed by William Lee Grant, II. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5136. [19-5136] [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:51 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1792655] filed by William Lee Grant, II [Service Date: 06/13/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5 pages. [19-5136] [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1789243] received from Will Grant [signed for on 05/14/2019] for order [1787299-2] sent to Appellant William Lee Grant, II [19-5136] [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • FIRST CLASS MAIL and CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1787299] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3380 0000 3149 8664] of order [ # 1787297-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 06/10/2019 from William Lee Grant II. [19-5136] [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1787297] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/01/2019. APPENDIX due 07/01/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5136] [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787287] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00641-UNA filed by William Lee Grant, II. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5136. [19-5136] [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5136] [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.