This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/29/2021 at 11:25:54 (UTC).

William Fuller, et al v. Joe Carollo

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 William Fuller filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Joe Carollo. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11746

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

JOE CAROLLO

Plaintiff / Appellees

WILLIAM O FULLER

MARTIN A. PINILLA, II

WILLIAM O. FULLER

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Benedict P. Kuehne

Attorney at Kuehne Davis Law, PA

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 3105

Miami, FL 33131-2154

Thomas Emerson Scott Jr.

Attorney at Cole Scott & Kissane, PA

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Brandon Perry Rose

Attorney at AXS Law Group, PLLC

2121 Nw 2Nd Ave Ste 201

Miami, FL 33127

Joshua Jay Shore

Attorney at Krinzman Huss Lubetsky Feldman & Hotte

169 E Flagler St Ste 500

Miami, FL 33131

Jeffrey W. Gutchess

Attorney at AXS Law Group, PLLC

2121 Nw 2Nd Ave Ste 201

Miami, FL 33127

Rossana Arteaga-Gomez

Attorney at AXS Law Group, PLLC

2121 Nw 2Nd Ave Ste 201

Miami, FL 33127

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Alejandro Brito

Attorney at Zarco Einhorn Salkowski & Brito, PA

2 S Biscayne Blvd Fl 34

Miami, FL 33131

Christopher Allan Green

Attorney at Office of the Miami City Attorney

444 Sw 2Nd Ave Ste 945

Miami, FL 33130

Oscar Edmund Marrero

Attorney at Marrero & Wydler

2600 S Douglas Rd Ph 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6143

Lourdes E. Wydler

Attorney at Marrero & Wydler

2600 S Douglas Rd Ph 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6143

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Rossana Arteaga-Gomez for Appellees William O. Fuller and Martin A. Pinilla, II. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11746] (ECF: Rossana Arteaga-Gomez) [Entered: 07/01/2021 04:23 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 06/08/2021 11:12 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11746] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:06 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. [21-11746] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/07/2021 10:50 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-11746] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/07/2021 10:49 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Benedict P. Kuehne for Joe Carollo. [21-11746] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/07/2021 10:47 AM]

Open Document #3

DC Order doc 186

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 07/19/2021 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Rossana Arteaga-Gomez for Appellees William O. Fuller and Martin A. Pinilla, II. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11746] (ECF: Rossana Arteaga-Gomez) [Entered: 07/01/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Rossana Arteaga-Gomez for Martin A. Pinilla, II and William O. Fuller, Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Martin A. Pinilla, II and William O. Fuller and Brandon Perry Rose for Martin A. Pinilla, II and William O. Fuller. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/28/2021 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. Appellants brief due on 07/20/2021 as to Appellant Joe Carollo. Appendix due on 07/27/2021 as to Appellant Joe Carollo. [Entered: 06/22/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 06/08/2021 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11746] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. [21-11746] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/07/2021 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Benedict P. Kuehne for Appellant Joe Carollo. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-11746] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/07/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Benedict P. Kuehne for Joe Carollo. [21-11746] (ECF: Benedict Kuehne) [Entered: 06/07/2021 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Joe Carollo on 05/22/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/06/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/07/2021 as to Appellant Joe Carollo. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/21/2021 as to Appellees [Entered: 05/25/2021 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Allan Green

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alejandro Brito

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lourdes E. Wydler