This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:06:39 (UTC).

William Foster v. Mr. Whitmore, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 William Foster filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Mr Whitmore. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1503

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Corizon Medical Services

Ronda J. Pash

Plaintiff / Appellant

William Wintworth Foster

Cameron, MO 64429-0000

Defendant / Appellee

Mr. Whitmore, Dentist

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Wintworth Foster

Attorney at CROSSROADS CORRECTIONAL CENTER

1115 E. Pence Road

Cameron, MO 64429-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

John Thaddeus Eckenrode

Attorney at ECKENRODE & MAUPIN

Suite 110, 11477 Olde Cabin Road

Saint Louis, MO 63141

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Envelope

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The District Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 04/11/2019 [4765820] [19-1503] [4765820] [19-1503]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:56 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 3/08/19, docket entries, Order 2/07/19, Judgment 2/07/19, Order 2/20/19, Order 3/11/19. [4765808] [19-1503]--[Edited 04/18/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Appellant has been directed to either pay the fee or file a pleading in this court explaining why he is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. The response is due April 12, 2019. Appellant has moved to stay the proceeding and seek an order compelling the warden to provide him with his legal files. Consideration of this motion will be stayed pending receipt of the fee or response to the court's order by the deadline. Failure to respond or pay the fee will result in dismissal of the appeal. [4772509] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 09:37 AM]

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Motion for Stay

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [4765793] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:35 PM]

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

Response to Order of Court

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode for Appellee Mr. Whitmore w/service 03/14/2019 [4767003] [19-1503] (JTE) [Entered: 03/14/2019 04:42 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Motion for stay filed by Appellant Mr. William Wintworth Foster in 19-1503 , [ # 4772465-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4778476] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 04/17/2019 07:20 AM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Account Statement

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4765845] [19-1503]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:19 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-1503: pending] [4779609] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: Motion for stay filed by Appellant Mr. William Wintworth Foster in 19-1503 , [ # 4772465-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4778476] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 04/17/2019 07:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Mr. William Wintworth Foster w/service by USCA8 on 04/16/2019. [4778286] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to clerk order of 4/01/19 [ # 4772509-2 ], and clerk order of 3/12/19 [ # 4765820-2 ], filed by Appellant Mr. William Wintworth Foster , w/service by USCA8 on 04/16/2019. [4778276] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: Appellant has been directed to either pay the fee or file a pleading in this court explaining why he is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. The response is due April 12, 2019. Appellant has moved to stay the proceeding and seek an order compelling the warden to provide him with his legal files. Consideration of this motion will be stayed pending receipt of the fee or response to the court's order by the deadline. Failure to respond or pay the fee will result in dismissal of the appeal. [4772509] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for temporary stay, filed by Appellant Mr. William Wintworth Foster w/service by USCA8 on 04/01/2019. [4772465] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode for Appellee Mr. Whitmore w/service 03/14/2019 [4767003] [19-1503] (JTE) [Entered: 03/14/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4765845] [19-1503]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: The District Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 04/11/2019 [4765820] [19-1503] [4765820] [19-1503]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 3/08/19, docket entries, Order 2/07/19, Judgment 2/07/19, Order 2/20/19, Order 3/11/19. [4765808] [19-1503]--[Edited 04/18/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4765793] [19-1503] (TMF) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.