This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 06:04:19 (UTC).

William Dickey v. SCDC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 William Dickey filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against SCDC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6308

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

EYE CLINIC

Defendant / Appellees

NURSE WITE

SCDC

WARDEN COHEN

DOCTOR LEMON

OFFICER HARRIS

LIEUTENANT BRYANT

NURSE SIMMONS

LIEUTENANT MAZE

SERGEANT DEVIN WILLIAMS

NURSE GRIMES

DOCTOR ROBERTS, Optical Lab

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM DEVON DICKEY

Ridgeland, SC 29936-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michael Charles Tanner

Attorney at MICHAEL C. TANNER LAW OFFICE

P. O. Box 1061

Bamberg, SC 29003

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Devon Dickey

Attorney at RIDGELAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P. O. Box 2039

Ridgeland, SC 29936-0000

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:17-cv-02194-DCC. Case manager: REdwards. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 09:59 AM]

#20

(#20) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Nurse Grimes, Officer Harris, Lieutenant Maze, SCDC, Lieutenant Bryant, Nurse Simmons, Nurse Wite and Devin Williams. [19-6308]--[Edited 04/03/2019 by JH] Michael Tanner [Entered: 04/02/2019 12:53 PM]

22 #2

Envelope

22 #1

Document

#25

(#25) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by William Devon Dickey. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:03 PM]

19 #2

Cover letter

#7

(#7) Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Lieutenant Bryant, Warden Cohen, Nurse Grimes, Officer Harris, Lieutenant Maze, SCDC, Nurse Simmons, Devin Williams and Nurse Wite. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000469263] [19-6308] Michael Tanner [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:32 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael C. Tanner for Lieutenant Bryant, Warden Cohen, Nurse Grimes, Officer Harris, Lieutenant Maze, SCDC, Nurse Simmons, Devin Williams and Nurse Wite. [1000469259] [19-6308] Michael Tanner [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:30 PM]

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ William Devon Dickey ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: William Dickey. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:01 AM]

19 #3

Envelope

#24

(#24) MOTION by William Devon Dickey to appoint/assign counsel. [1000493163] [19-6308] RE [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:54 PM]

#8

(#8) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 03/25/2019. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/11/2019 12:51 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: William Dickey. Informal Opening Brief due 03/28/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:03 AM]

19 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

10 #2

Envelope

#23

(#23) Supplemental INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by SCDC, Warden Cohen, Nurse Grimes, Lieutenant Bryant, Lieutenant Maze, Devin Williams, Nurse Simmons, Nurse Wite and Officer Harris. [19-6308] Michael Tanner [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:12 PM]

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by William Devon Dickey. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION by William Devon Dickey to appoint/assign counsel. [1000493163] [19-6308] RE [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Supplemental INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by SCDC, Warden Cohen, Nurse Grimes, Lieutenant Bryant, Lieutenant Maze, Devin Williams, Nurse Simmons, Nurse Wite and Officer Harris. [19-6308] Michael Tanner [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Nurse Grimes, Officer Harris, Lieutenant Maze, SCDC, Lieutenant Bryant, Nurse Simmons, Nurse Wite and Devin Williams. [19-6308]--[Edited 04/03/2019 by JH] Michael Tanner [Entered: 04/02/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) DOCUMENT - facts of the case by William Devon Dickey. [1000486278] [19-6308] TW [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#21) Supplement to PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by William Devon Dickey. Consent to Payment Form: No; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6308] TW [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by William Devon Dickey. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/26/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER filed [1000482233] deferring action on Motion to appoint/assign counsel filed by Appellant William Devon Dickey [ # 17 ] Until: consideration of the merits of the appeal pending completion of informal briefing. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: William Dickey. [19-6308] JH [Entered: 03/26/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION by William Devon Dickey to appoint/assign counsel. [1000482110] [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/26/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by William Devon Dickey to supplement informal opening brief. [1000482108] [19-6308--[Edited 03/26/2019 by RE-See ECF No. 19] RE [Entered: 03/26/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by William Devon Dickey. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • (#9) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 9:17-cv-02194-DCC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/13/2019 07:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 03/25/2019. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/11/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Lieutenant Bryant, Warden Cohen, Nurse Grimes, Officer Harris, Lieutenant Maze, SCDC, Nurse Simmons, Devin Williams and Nurse Wite. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000469263] [19-6308] Michael Tanner [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael C. Tanner for Lieutenant Bryant, Warden Cohen, Nurse Grimes, Officer Harris, Lieutenant Maze, SCDC, Nurse Simmons, Devin Williams and Nurse Wite. [1000469259] [19-6308] Michael Tanner [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Nurse Grimes, Officer Harris, Lieutenant Maze, SCDC, Nurse Simmons, Devin Williams and Nurse Wite. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000469104] [19-6308--[Edited 03/05/2019 by RE-See ECF No. 7] Michael Tanner [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael C. Tanner for Lieutenant Bryant, Warden Cohen, Nurse Grimes, Officer Harris, Lieutenant Maze, SCDC, Nurse Simmons, Devin Williams and Nurse Wite. [1000469095] [19-6308--[Edited 03/05/2019 by RE-See ECF No.6] Michael Tanner [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: William Dickey. Informal Opening Brief due 03/28/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ William Devon Dickey ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: William Dickey. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:17-cv-02194-DCC. Case manager: REdwards. [19-6308] RE [Entered: 03/04/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less