This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:06:26 (UTC).

William DeForte v. Borough of Worthington, et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 William DeForte filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Borough of Worthington. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1755

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KEVIN FEENEY, Individually and as Mayor of the Borough of Worthington

JOSEPH R. ZANDARSKI

GERALD RODGERS, Individually and as a Police Officer of the Borough of Worthington, Jointly and Severally

BOROUGH OF WORTHINGTON

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM DEFORTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sheryl L. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Siana Bellwoar & McAndrew

941 Pottstown Pike, Suite 200

Chester Springs, PA 19425

Michael E. Kennedy Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kemal A. Mericli Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Alan T. Shuckrow Esq.

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 2200, Four Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Erica L. Laughlin Esq.

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 2200, Four Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Eric M. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Siana Bellwoar & McAndrew

941 Pottstown Pike, Suite 200

Chester Springs, PA 19425

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lawrence E. Bolind Esq. Jr.

238 Main Street

Imperial, PA 15126

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

CLERK ORDER advising that it appears it would not be appropriate to list the case for possible dismissal. All responses filed by the parties regarding the jurisdictional issue are referred to the Merits Panel. This does not any way signify that a determination of jurisdiction has been made. Only the Court can make such a decision. The parties are directed to address this Court's jurisdiction in their briefs, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:09 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) notifying transcript by Court Reporter Ms. Barbara Leo in 19-1755, 19-1762 filed in District Court on 04/22/2019. Actual Pages: 73. [19-1755, 19-1762] (PDB) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:38 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kemal Alexander Mericli on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph R. Zandarski. [19-1755] (KAM) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:55 AM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael E. Kennedy, Esq. for Joseph R. Zandarski requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/07/2019. (KR) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:01 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CORRECTED Response filed by Appellant William DeForte to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1755, 19-1762] [SEND TO MERITS]--[Edited 05/29/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 09:07 PM]

Open Document #3

Lower Court Opinion

Open Document #2

Lower Court Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant William DeForte in 19-1755, 19-1762 advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Barbara Leo. [19-1755, 19-1762] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:04 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. All parties must file written responses addressing these jurisdictional issues, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order., filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:35 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Consolidating for All Purposes, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:28 AM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

District Court Opinion 030419

Open Document #2

District Court Order 030419

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. [19-1755, 19-1762] (TNH) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER advising that it appears it would not be appropriate to list the case for possible dismissal. All responses filed by the parties regarding the jurisdictional issue are referred to the Merits Panel. This does not any way signify that a determination of jurisdiction has been made. Only the Court can make such a decision. The parties are directed to address this Court's jurisdiction in their briefs, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) notifying transcript by Court Reporter Ms. Barbara Leo in 19-1755, 19-1762 filed in District Court on 04/22/2019. Actual Pages: 73. [19-1755, 19-1762] (PDB) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kemal Alexander Mericli on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph R. Zandarski. [19-1755] (KAM) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael E. Kennedy, Esq. for Joseph R. Zandarski requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/07/2019. (KR) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CORRECTED Response filed by Appellant William DeForte to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1755, 19-1762] [SEND TO MERITS]--[Edited 05/29/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 09:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant William DeForte to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 04/22/2019. Service made by ECF. Document removed - Corrected Response was filed. [19-1755, 19-1762]--[Edited 04/23/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant William DeForte in 19-1755, 19-1762, received. [19-1755, 19-1762] (LEB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Erica L. Laughlin on behalf of Appellee(s) Gerald Rodgers.--[Edited 04/22/2019 by KR] (ELL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Erica L. Laughlin on behalf of Appellee(s) Gerald Rodgers. Wrong document attached removed - Document refiled correctly---[Edited 04/22/2019 by KR] (ELL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) William DeForte. ]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) William DeForte. --[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CORRECTED Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant William DeForte in advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: Transcript of hearing regarding Motion for Summary Judgment - 11-26-18., to be filed by Barara Leo. [19-1755, 19-1762]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant William DeForte, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant William DeForte, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant William DeForte in 19-1755, 19-1762 advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Barbara Leo. [19-1755, 19-1762] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. All parties must file written responses addressing these jurisdictional issues, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order., filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting Consolidating for All Purposes, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant William DeForte in District Court No. 2-16-cv-00067. (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less