Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2020 at 06:15:03 (UTC).

William Davis, Jr. v. United States Department of S, et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 William Davis, Jr filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against United States Department of S. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2237

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM S. DAVIS, JR.

Thomson, IL 61285

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE

FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William S. Davis Jr.

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY

P.O. Box 1002

Thomson, IL 61285

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Filed district court order dated 08/24/2020, The Court denies Plaintiffs motion to reopen this case. The Court has considered no fewer than six post-judgment motions, and need not continue to revisit the issue. The Court also denies Plaintiffs second, third, and fourth applications to appeal in forma pauperis as duplicative insofar as the Court previously denied Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. The Court notes, however, that the certification on at least one of the renewed applicationswhich requires certification by an authorized prison officialwas not signed by the officer whose name appears on the certification. The certification on a second application appears similarly suspect. [10] [7103243] [20-2237] (CM) [Entered: 08/25/2020 08:56 AM]

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER re: Motion for Review of the District Court's 28 USC 1915(g) Erroneous Determinations. [ # 6 ] To the extent that the appellant seeks an extension of time, the motion is GRANTED and the appellant shall either pay the $505.00 filing fees in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the clerk of this court, together with a PLRA memorandum in support, by 09/21/2020. Any other relief requested in the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the fee notice and order dated 07/09/2020. CMD [8] [7099721] [20-2237] (MM) [Entered: 08/10/2020 09:24 AM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William S. Davis, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7099458] [20-2237] (CM) [Entered: 08/07/2020 10:22 AM]

#6

(#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William S. Davis, Jr. for review of the district court's erronoeus determinations. [6] [7099419] [20-2237] (MAN) [Entered: 08/07/2020 09:55 AM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William S. Davis, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7098652] [20-2237] (PNR) [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:37 PM]

4 #2

PLRA Fee Notice AC

4 #1

PLRA D.C. Denial of IFP

#3

(#3) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7092577] [20-2237] (CG) [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:17 AM]

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed district court order dated 08/24/2020, The Court denies Plaintiffs motion to reopen this case. The Court has considered no fewer than six post-judgment motions, and need not continue to revisit the issue. The Court also denies Plaintiffs second, third, and fourth applications to appeal in forma pauperis as duplicative insofar as the Court previously denied Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. The Court notes, however, that the certification on at least one of the renewed applicationswhich requires certification by an authorized prison officialwas not signed by the officer whose name appears on the certification. The certification on a second application appears similarly suspect. [10] [7103243] [20-2237] (CM) [Entered: 08/25/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Prose motion filed by Appellant William S. Davis, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with PLRA Memorandum in support. [9] [7101200] [20-2237] (CAH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re: Motion for Review of the District Court's 28 USC 1915(g) Erroneous Determinations. [ # 6 ] To the extent that the appellant seeks an extension of time, the motion is GRANTED and the appellant shall either pay the $505.00 filing fees in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the clerk of this court, together with a PLRA memorandum in support, by 09/21/2020. Any other relief requested in the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the fee notice and order dated 07/09/2020. CMD [8] [7099721] [20-2237] (MM) [Entered: 08/10/2020 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William S. Davis, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7099458] [20-2237] (CM) [Entered: 08/07/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William S. Davis, Jr. for review of the district court's erronoeus determinations. [6] [7099419] [20-2237] (MAN) [Entered: 08/07/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William S. Davis, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7098652] [20-2237] (PNR) [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant William S. Davis, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/20/2020. [4] [7095417] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 08/21/2020 [20-2237] (CAH) [Entered: 07/22/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7092577] [20-2237] (CG) [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: United States Executive Offices of the United States Attorney Offices, United States Administrative Offices of the Courts, United States Department Of Justice, United States Embassy Belgium, United States Passport Agency, United States Immigration, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Health and Human Services Administration for Child and Family Services. [2] [7092576] [20-2237] (CG) [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Federal prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant William S. Davis Jr. by 07/16/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 07/23/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 08/10/2020. [1] [7092567] [20-2237] (CG) [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Investigation is a litigant

Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant