This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/04/2021 at 06:05:06 (UTC).

William Burrell, Jr., et al v. Tom Staff, et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 William Burrell, Jr , filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tom Staff,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2846

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Appellants

ANTHONY CRAVATH

ANTHONY JOHN GOODWIN, JR.

DERRICK M. LAKE

EUGENE R. TAYLOR

RALPH WASKO

TIMOTHY ALAN WHITED

TORRANCE ALLEN

GABRIEL MARTINEZ

GERARD NELSON

Plaintiff / Appellants

WILLIAM L. BURRELL, JR.

JOSHUA HUZZARD

DAMPSEY STUCKEY

Defendant / Appellees

TOM STAFF, Individually

LOUIS DENAPLES, individually

DOMINICK DENAPLES

LACKAWANNA RECYCLING CENTER INC

COUNTY OF LACKAWANNA

LACKAWANNA COUNTY SOLID WASTE MANAGEMENT AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Appellant Attorneys

William A. Anderson Esq.

Attorney at Handley Farah & Anderson

4730 Table Messa Drive, Suite G-200

Boulder, CO 80305

Matthew K. Handley Esq.

Attorney at Handley Farah & Anderson

200 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Seventh Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Marielle R. Macher Esq.

Attorney at Community Justice Project

118 Locust Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Madeline Meth Esq.

Attorney at Georgetown University Law Center

600 New Jersey Avenue, Suite 312

Washington, DC 20001

Rachel E. Nadas Esq.

Attorney at Handley Farah & Anderson

200 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Seventh Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Brianne Power Esq.

Attorney at Towards Justice

1410 High Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80218

David H. Seligman Esq.

Attorney at Towards Justice

1410 High Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80218

Juno Turner Esq.

Attorney at Towards Justice

1410 High Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80218

Brian S. Wolfman Esq.

Attorney at Georgetown University Law Center

600 New Jersey Avenue, N.W., Suite 312

Washington, DC 20001

Peter Zurflieh Esq.

Attorney at Community Justice Project

118 Locust Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Philip A. Davolos Esq. III

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner

415 Wyoming Avenue

Scranton, PA 18503

David E. Heisler Esq.

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner

415 Wyoming Avenue

Scranton, PA 18503

Jeffrey Belardi Esq.

Attorney at Belardi Law Offices

50 Alberigi Drive, Suite 114, The Tekridge Center

Jessup, PA 18434

Christopher R. Nestor Esq.

Attorney at Overstreet & Nestor

1425 Crooked Hill Road, #62066

Harrisburg, PA 17106

David R. Overstreet Esq.

Attorney at Overstreet & Nestor

461 Cochran Road, P.O. Box 237

Pittsburgh, PA 15228

Sal Cognetti Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Cognetti & Cimini

538 Spruce Street, 800 Scranton Life Building

Scranton, PA 18503

Sarah R. Lloyd Esq.

Attorney at Cognetti & Cimini

538 Spruce Street, 800 Scranton Life Building

Scranton, PA 18503

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Marielle R. Macher on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (MRM) [Entered: 11/16/2021 10:00 AM]

#19

(#19) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Jr., Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko and Timothy Alan Whited for Extension of Time to file Opening brief until/for 30 days. Certificate of Service dated 11/10/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-2846] (MM) [Entered: 11/10/2021 06:34 PM]

18 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

18 #1

Standing Order

#17

(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Rachel Nadas on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (REN) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:23 PM]

#16

(#16) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew Handley on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (MKH) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:13 PM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah Rose Lloyd, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Lackawanna County Solid Waste Management Authority. [21-2846] (SRL) [Entered: 10/20/2021 02:00 PM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey Belardi on behalf of Appellee(s) Louis DeNaples, Dominick DeNaples, Lackawanna Recycling Center, Inc.. [21-2846] (JB) [Entered: 10/19/2021 05:18 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Philip A. Davolos, III on behalf of Appellee(s) Tom Staff and Lackawanna County. [21-2846] (PAD) [Entered: 10/19/2021 10:03 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Madeline Meth on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (MM) [Entered: 10/07/2021 03:49 PM]

#4

#3

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Case Caption

1 #4

District Court Memorandum dated 080621

1 #3

District Court Order dated 080621

1 #2

District Court Order dated 083121

#1

Civil Case Docketed

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion filed by Appellants for an extension of time to file brief and appendix until January 6, 2022.. (CLW) [Entered: 11/19/2021 05:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Marielle R. Macher on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (MRM) [Entered: 11/16/2021 10:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Jr., Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko and Timothy Alan Whited for Extension of Time to file Opening brief until/for 30 days. Certificate of Service dated 11/10/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-2846] (MM) [Entered: 11/10/2021 06:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin Jr., Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko and Timothy Alan Whited due on or before 12/07/2021. Appendix due on or before 12/07/2021. (PDB) [Entered: 10/28/2021 10:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Rachel Nadas on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (REN) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew Handley on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (MKH) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah Rose Lloyd, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Lackawanna County Solid Waste Management Authority. [21-2846] (SRL) [Entered: 10/20/2021 02:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey Belardi on behalf of Appellee(s) Louis DeNaples, Dominick DeNaples, Lackawanna Recycling Center, Inc.. [21-2846] (JB) [Entered: 10/19/2021 05:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Philip A. Davolos, III on behalf of Appellee(s) Tom Staff and Lackawanna County. [21-2846] (PAD) [Entered: 10/19/2021 10:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David E. Heisler, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Tom Staff and Lackawanna County. [21-2846] (DEH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 11:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Jr., Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko and Timothy Alan Whited advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-2846] (MM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 04:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Jr., Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko and Timothy Alan Whited. [21-2846] (MM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Jr., Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko and Timothy Alan Whited. [21-2846] (MM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian Wolfman on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (BSW) [Entered: 10/08/2021 06:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David R. Overstreet on behalf of Appellee(s) Louis DeNaples, Dominic DeNaples, Lackawanna Recycling Center, Inc.. [21-2846] (DRO) [Entered: 10/08/2021 01:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Madeline Meth on behalf of Appellant(s) Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko, Timothy A. Whited. [21-2846] (MM) [Entered: 10/07/2021 03:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Lackawanna Recycling Center Inc. [21-2846] (CRN) [Entered: 10/06/2021 07:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher R. Nestor on behalf of Appellee(s) Louis DeNaples, Dominick DeNaples, Lackawanna Recycling Center, Inc.. [21-2846] (CRN) [Entered: 10/06/2021 07:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 10/05/2021 12:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Torrance Allen, William L. Burrell, Jr., Anthony Cravath, Anthony John Goodwin, Joshua Huzzard, Derrick M. Lake, Gabriel Martinez, Gerard Nelson, Dampsey Stuckey, Eugene R. Taylor, Ralph Wasko and Timothy Alan Whited in District Court No. 3-14-cv-01891. (PDB) [Entered: 10/05/2021 12:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARIELLE MACHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Hollis Seligman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Emily Nadas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew K. Handley