This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2019 at 06:05:10 (UTC).

William Burns, et al v. Victoria Femiani, et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 William Burns filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Victoria Femiani. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1413

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

ENCOMPASS INSURANCE

TROOPER ALONZO J. ANDERSON, sued in his individual capacity acting under color of official capacity and scope of employment as a sworn officer of the PA State Police, #08652

PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE, under the doctrine of Respondent Superior

TROOPER ROBERT H. KEEFER, sued in his individual capacity acting under color of official capacity and scope of employment as a sworn officer of the PA State Police, #08387

REGINAL CLAIMS EXPEDITERS, a/k/a Rick Marcinko

VICTORIA E. FEMIANI

TROOPER SHAWN FABIAN, sued in his individual capacity acting under color of official capacity and scope of employment as a sworn officer of the PA State Police, #10043

ERIE INSURANCE GROUP

JEFFREY W. WALTER

Plaintiff / Appellants

WILLIAM J. BURNS

East Liverpool, OH 43920

KAREN K. BURNS, Husband and Wife

426 Thompson Avenue

East Liverpool, OH 43920

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

J. David Ziegler Esq.

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Robert J. Marino Esq.

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Jason H. Peck Esq.

Attorney at DiBella Geer McAllister & Best

20 Stanwix Street, 11Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Richard W. DiBella Esq.

Attorney at DiBella Geer McAllister & Best

20 Stanwix Street, 11Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Robert A. Loch Esq.

Attorney at Robb Leonard & Mulvihill

500 Grant Street, Bny Mellon Center, 23Rd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William J. Burns

426 Thompson Avenue

East Liverpool, OH 43920

Karen K. Burns

426 Thompson Avenue

East Liverpool, OH 43920

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard W. DiBella on behalf of Appellee Erie Insurance Group. [19-1413]--[Edited 04/11/2019 by KR] (RWD) [Entered: 04/11/2019 08:16 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Erie Insurance Group, filed. [19-1413] (JHP) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:22 AM]

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellants Karen K. Burns and William J. Burns regarding the brief and appendix received on 04/12/2019. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 04/23/2019. The deadline for the next brief will be determined by Order or from the service date of the compliant brief. (MS) [Entered: 04/16/2019 11:09 AM]

Open Document #3

District Court Judgment 012519

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. David Ziegler on behalf of Appellee(s) Encompass Insurance. [19-1413] (JDZ) [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:06 PM]

Open Document #3

Briefing Info for Pro Se Litigants

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #2

District Court Order 012519

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. Marino on behalf of Appellee(s) Encompass Insurance. [19-1413] (RJM) [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:08 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert A. Loch, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Jeffrey W. Walter. [19-1413] (RAL) [Entered: 03/21/2019 02:47 PM]

Open Document #2

Standing Order

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Robert A. Loch, Esq. for Jeffrey W. Walter requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/25/2019. (KR) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:03 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jason H. Peck; Paul K. Geer on behalf of Appellee(s) Erie Insurance Group. [19-1413] (JHP) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:20 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellants Karen K. Burns and William J. Burns regarding the brief and appendix received on 04/12/2019. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 04/23/2019. The deadline for the next brief will be determined by Order or from the service date of the compliant brief. (MS) [Entered: 04/16/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard W. DiBella on behalf of Appellee Erie Insurance Group. [19-1413]--[Edited 04/11/2019 by KR] (RWD) [Entered: 04/11/2019 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert A. Loch, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Jeffrey W. Walter. [19-1413] (RAL) [Entered: 03/21/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. Marino on behalf of Appellee(s) Encompass Insurance. [19-1413] (RJM) [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. David Ziegler on behalf of Appellee(s) Encompass Insurance. [19-1413] (JDZ) [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Robert A. Loch, Esq. for Jeffrey W. Walter requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/25/2019. (KR) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Erie Insurance Group, filed. [19-1413] (JHP) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jason H. Peck; Paul K. Geer on behalf of Appellee(s) Erie Insurance Group. [19-1413] (JHP) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Karen K. Burns and William J. Burns due on or before 04/10/2019. Appendix due on or before 04/10/2019. (KR) [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 02/22/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Karen K. Burns and William J. Burns in District Court No. 1-18-cv-00391. (KR) [Entered: 02/22/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.