This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/01/2020 at 06:14:49 (UTC).

William Berry, Jr., et al v. Desert Palace, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 William Berry, Jr filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Desert Palace, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16914

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CYNTHIA FALLS

SHANE KAUFMANN

Defendant / Appellee

DESERT PALACE, INC., DBA Caesars Palace

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM J. BERRY, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Patrick H. Hicks Esquire

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Ethan Thomas Esquire

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jason Maier

Attorney at Maier Gutierrez

2500 West Sahara Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89102

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellee Desert Palace, Inc. reply to response to order to show cause dated 10/22/2020. Date of service: 11/23/2020. [11903066] [20-16914] (Thomas, Ethan) [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:14 AM]

#12

(#12) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/03/2020. See order for details. [11894294] (BLS) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:03 PM]

11 #2

Additional Document

11 #1

Main Document

#10

(#10) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/09/2020. See order for details. [11871833] (BLS) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:30 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal may not be final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)); see also Atkins, Kroll (Guam), Ltd. v. Cabrera, 277 F.2d 922, 923-24 (9th Cir. 1960) (judgment on claim separated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b) not immediately appealable absent compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11869073] (AF) [Entered: 10/22/2020 04:03 PM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED AMENDED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/23/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time (previously scheduled for 10:00 a.m.). [11868216] (BLS) [Entered: 10/22/2020 10:00 AM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/23/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 10/22/2020). [11867782] (BLS) [Entered: 10/21/2020 04:58 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/22/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11860821] (BLS) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:53 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant William J. Berry, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/09/2020. [11854324] [20-16914] (Maier, Jason) [Entered: 10/09/2020 01:57 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellee Desert Palace, Inc. reply to response to order to show cause dated 10/22/2020. Date of service: 11/23/2020. [11903066] [20-16914] (Thomas, Ethan) [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/03/2020. See order for details. [11894294] (BLS) [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant William J. Berry, Jr. response to Court order dated 11/12/2020. Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11891302] [20-16914] (Maier, Jason) [Entered: 11/12/2020 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/09/2020. See order for details. [11871833] (BLS) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal may not be final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)); see also Atkins, Kroll (Guam), Ltd. v. Cabrera, 277 F.2d 922, 923-24 (9th Cir. 1960) (judgment on claim separated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b) not immediately appealable absent compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11869073] (AF) [Entered: 10/22/2020 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED AMENDED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/23/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time (previously scheduled for 10:00 a.m.). [11868216] (BLS) [Entered: 10/22/2020 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/23/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 10/22/2020). [11867782] (BLS) [Entered: 10/21/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/22/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11860821] (BLS) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/09/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11854992]. [20-16914] (AD) [Entered: 10/09/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant William J. Berry, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/09/2020. [11854324] [20-16914] (Maier, Jason) [Entered: 10/09/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Ethan Thomas for party(s) Appellee Desert Palace, Inc., in case 20-16914. [11852828] (CW) [Entered: 10/08/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ethan D. Thomas (Littler Mendleson, P.C., 3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300, Las Vegas, NV 89169) for Appellee Desert Palace, Inc.. Date of service: 10/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11852745] [20-16914] (Thomas, Ethan) [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant William J. Berry Jr. Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/09/2020. Transcript ordered by 11/02/2020. Transcript due 11/30/2020. Appellant William J. Berry Jr. opening brief due 01/11/2021. Appellee Desert Palace, Inc. answering brief due 02/10/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11845347] (JBS) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT PALACE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Maier