This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/17/2021 at 06:04:30 (UTC).

William Berry, Jr., et al v. Desert Palace, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 William Berry, Jr , filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Desert Palace, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16713

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CYNTHIA FALLS

SHANE KAUFMANN

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM J. BERRY, Jr.

Defendant / Appellee

DESERT PALACE, INC., DBA Caesars Palace

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jason Maier

Danielle Jena Barraza Esquire

Kathleen Jane England

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ethan Thomas Esquire

Patrick H. Hicks

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant William J. Berry, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/25/2021. [12267464] [21-16713] (Barraza, Danielle) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:08 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/08/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12272519] (BLS) [Entered: 10/29/2021 08:27 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/08/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12272519] (BLS) [Entered: 10/29/2021 08:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/25/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12268311]. [21-16713] (AD) [Entered: 10/25/2021 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant William J. Berry, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/25/2021. [12267464] [21-16713] (Barraza, Danielle) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant William J. Berry Jr. Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/25/2021. Transcript ordered by 11/15/2021. Transcript due 12/13/2021. Appellant William J. Berry Jr. opening brief due 01/24/2022. Appellee Desert Palace, Inc. answering brief due 02/23/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12259733] (JBS) [Entered: 10/18/2021 11:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less